Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-15 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6003140) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 03/15/2019) |
2019-03-15 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 03/15/2019) |
2019-03-15 | | Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/15/2019) |
2019-03-15 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/15/2019) |
2019-03-22 | 4 | STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 03/22/19. (Attachment: # Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-04-03 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/22/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/21/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/22/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/22/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 04/03/2019) |
2019-04-22 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Powers, James) (Entered: 04/22/2019) |
2019-05-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than May 24, 2019. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiff's FOIA requests; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA requests; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA requests; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/2/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 05/02/2019) |
2019-05-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/24/2019. (mac) (Entered: 05/03/2019) |
2019-05-14 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Eric William Payne Lee on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 05/14/2019) |
2019-05-24 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT re Minute Order dated May 2, 2019 by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Powers, James) (Entered: 05/24/2019) |
2019-05-29 | | MINUTE ORDER. In view of the 8 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report informing the Court of the status of Plaintiff's FOIA requests and proposing a joint recommendation for further proceedings by no later than August 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/29/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 05/29/2019) |
2019-05-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Recommendation For Further Proceedings due by 8/23/2019. (mac) (Entered: 05/30/2019) |
2019-08-23 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Powers, James) (Entered: 08/23/2019) |
2019-08-26 | | MINUTE ORDER. In view of the 9 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report by no later than January 10, 2020, informing the Court of the status of Plaintiff's FOIA requests and proposing a recommendation for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/26/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 08/26/2019) |
2019-08-26 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/10/2020 (mac) (Entered: 08/26/2019) |
2020-01-10 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Powers, James) (Entered: 01/10/2020) |
2020-01-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. In view of the 10 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report by no later than March 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/10/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 01/10/2020) |
2020-01-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/10/2020. (mac) (Entered: 01/13/2020) |
2020-03-10 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Powers, James) (Entered: 03/10/2020) |
2020-03-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. In view of the 11 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later June 9, 2020. The parties shall file a proposed order with each joint status report. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/10/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 03/10/2020) |
2020-03-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/9/2020. (mac) (Entered: 03/11/2020) |
2020-06-09 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Powers, James) (Entered: 06/09/2020) |
2020-06-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. In view of 12 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than August 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/10/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 06/10/2020) |
2020-06-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/10/2020. (mac) (Entered: 06/11/2020) |
2020-08-10 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Powers, James) (Entered: 08/10/2020) |
2020-08-11 | | MINUTE ORDER. In view of 13 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with recommendations for further proceedings by no later than December 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/11/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 08/11/2020) |
2020-08-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/8/2020. (mac) (Entered: 08/12/2020) |
2020-12-08 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 12/08/2020) |
2020-12-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. In view of 14 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than January 14, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/8/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 12/08/2020) |
2020-12-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/14/2021 (mac) (Entered: 12/09/2020) |
2021-01-14 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Powers, James) (Entered: 01/14/2021) |
2021-01-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. In view of 15 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than March 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/14/2021. (lcegs3) (Entered: 01/14/2021) |
2021-01-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/16/2021. (mac) (Entered: 01/15/2021) |
2021-03-16 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Powers, James) (Entered: 03/16/2021) |
2021-03-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. In view of 16 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than July 9, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/16/2021. (lcegs3) (Entered: 03/16/2021) |
2021-03-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/9/2021. (mac) (Entered: 03/17/2021) |
2021-07-08 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 07/08/2021) |
2021-07-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. In view of 17 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than October 9, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/16/2021. (lcegs1) (Entered: 07/16/2021) |
2021-07-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/9/2021 (mac) (Entered: 07/17/2021) |
2021-10-07 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Proposed Order))(Powers, James) (Entered: 10/07/2021) |
2021-11-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. In view of 18 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than November 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/2/2021. (lcegs3) (Entered: 11/02/2021) |
2021-11-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/19/2021 (mac) (Entered: 11/03/2021) |
2021-11-19 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 11/19/2021) |
2021-11-23 | | MINUTE ORDER. In view of 19 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than January 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/23/2021. (lcegs3) (Entered: 11/23/2021) |
2021-11-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/21/2022 (mac) (Entered: 11/23/2021) |
2022-01-11 | 20 | NOTICE of Appearance by Taisa M. Goodnature on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Goodnature, Taisa) (Main Document 20 replaced on 1/11/2022) (zjf). (Entered: 01/11/2022) |
2022-01-21 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 01/21/2022) |
2022-01-21 | | MINUTE ORDER. In view of 21 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than February 22, 2022. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/21/2022. (lcegs3) (Entered: 01/21/2022) |
2022-01-24 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/22/2022 (mac) (Entered: 01/24/2022) |
2022-02-22 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodnature, Taisa) (Entered: 02/22/2022) |
2022-02-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. In view of 22 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than March 24, 2022. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/22/2022. (lcegs3) (Entered: 02/22/2022) |
2022-02-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/24/2022 (mac) (Entered: 02/23/2022) |
2022-03-22 | 23 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 03/22/2022) |
Hide Docket Events |