Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-20 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6012042) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of State)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-20 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-21 | | Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-21 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-27 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/26/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/25/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/26/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 3/26/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 03/27/2019) |
2019-04-25 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/25/2019) |
2019-04-29 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by May 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/29/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 04/29/2019) |
2019-04-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule or Disclosure due by 5/28/2019. (kh) (Entered: 04/29/2019) |
2019-05-28 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/28/2019) |
2019-05-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, no later than July 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/28/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 05/28/2019) |
2019-07-25 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/25/2019) |
2019-07-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, no later than September 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/25/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/25/2019) |
2019-09-05 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 09/05/2019) |
2019-09-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, no later than November 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/5/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 09/05/2019) |
2019-11-20 | 9 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/20/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |