Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-21 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6014073) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of State, # 5 Summons U.S. Agency for International Development)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-21 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-22 | | Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-03-22 | 3 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-03-22 | 4 | STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are directed to read and strictly comply with the attached order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/22/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-04-01 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/1/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/1/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/1/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 4/1/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 04/01/2019) |
2019-04-01 | 6 | ERRATA re 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/1/2019. (Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/1/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/1/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Attachment: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Cotca, Ramona); Modified on 4/2/2019 (tth). (Entered: 04/01/2019) |
2019-04-09 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 04/09/2019) |
2019-05-02 | 8 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 05/02/2019) |
2019-05-03 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of the Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to the Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by the Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn Index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the report on or before June 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/3/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 05/03/2019) |
2019-05-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/3/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 05/03/2019) |
2019-06-03 | 9 | STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 06/03/2019) |
2019-06-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: A status conference is hereby scheduled for June 21, 2019 at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/4/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/04/2019) |
2019-06-04 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 06/04/2019) |
2019-06-06 | 10 | STATUS REPORT and Response to Defendants' Status Report by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 06/06/2019) |
2019-06-17 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by Eric William Payne Lee on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 06/17/2019) |
2019-06-21 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Status Conference held on 6/21/2019. The parties' next status report is due by 8/5/2019. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim.) (hmc) (Entered: 06/21/2019) |
2019-08-05 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 08/05/2019) |
2019-08-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before September 5, 2019. This report shall propose a schedule for further proceedings as necessary. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/5/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 08/05/2019) |
2019-08-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/5/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 08/05/2019) |
2019-09-05 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 09/05/2019) |
2019-09-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before October 7, 2019. This report shall propose a schedule for further proceedings as necessary. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/5/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 09/05/2019) |
2019-09-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/7/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 09/05/2019) |
2019-10-07 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 10/07/2019) |
2019-10-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before November 7, 2019. The report shall indicate whether there are any remaining disputes between the parties and whether a briefing schedule will be necessary. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/8/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 10/08/2019) |
2019-10-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/7/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 10/08/2019) |
2019-11-07 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 11/07/2019) |
2019-11-07 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another Report on or before December 9, 2019, indicating whether there are any remaining issues and whether a briefing schedule should be set. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/7/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 11/07/2019) |
2019-11-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/9/2019. (tg) (Entered: 11/07/2019) |
2019-12-09 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 12/09/2019) |
2019-12-09 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another Report on or before January 9, 2020, indicating whether there are any remaining issues and whether a briefing schedule should be set. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/9/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 12/09/2019) |
2019-12-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/9/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 12/09/2019) |
2020-01-09 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 01/09/2020) |
2020-01-09 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another Report by February 7, 2020, which shall propose terms regarding costs and fees. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/9/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 01/09/2020) |
2020-01-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/7/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 01/09/2020) |
2020-02-06 | 18 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 02/06/2020) |
2020-02-06 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 18 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice per the terms of the stipulation. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/6/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 02/06/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |