Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-26 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6023471) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Civil Process Clerk, # 3 Summons DOI, # 4 Summons OSMRE, # 5 Summons U.S. AG)(McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/26/2019) |
2019-03-26 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/26/2019) |
2019-03-27 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/27/2019) |
2019-03-27 | 3 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/27/2019) |
2019-04-08 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/2/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/2/2019. (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/08/2019) |
2019-04-08 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/03/2019. (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/08/2019) |
2019-04-08 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 4/1/2019 (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/08/2019) |
2019-04-08 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT served on 4/1/2019 (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/08/2019) |
2019-04-09 | 8 | NOTICE of Appearance by Alexa Marie Carreno on behalf of WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Carreno, Alexa) (Entered: 04/09/2019) |
2019-05-01 | 9 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 05/01/2019) |
2019-05-01 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by June 3, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/1/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/01/2019) |
2019-06-03 | 10 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to REspond to Complaint by OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 06/03/2019) |
2019-06-04 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants must file an answer to the complaint or otherwise respond by July 2, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/4/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 06/04/2019) |
2019-06-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 7/2/2019. (tg) (Entered: 06/04/2019) |
2019-06-26 | 11 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 06/26/2019) |
2019-06-28 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants must file an answer to the complaint or otherwise respond by August 5, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/28/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 06/28/2019) |
2019-08-02 | 12 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 08/02/2019) |
2019-08-08 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants must file an answer to the complaint or otherwise respond by September 19, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/8/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 08/08/2019) |
2019-09-17 | 13 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint , Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 09/17/2019) |
2019-09-18 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants must file an answer to the complaint or otherwise respond by October 18, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/18/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 09/18/2019) |
2019-10-16 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 10/16/2019) |
2019-10-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. The deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint set forth in the Court's minute order of September 18, 2019 is hereby VACATED. The parties must submit a joint status report by October 30, 2019, if the case has not been dismissed by then. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/17/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 10/17/2019) |
2019-10-30 | 15 | STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT, JOINT by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Carreno, Alexa) (Entered: 10/30/2019) |
2019-11-06 | 16 | STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/6/19. (DMK) (Entered: 11/06/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |