Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-27 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6025310) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 03/27/2019) |
2019-03-27 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 03/27/2019) |
2019-03-27 | | Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/27/2019) |
2019-03-27 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/27/2019) |
2019-04-17 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/27/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/26/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/04/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/1/2019 (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 04/17/2019) |
2019-04-25 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Myers on behalf of All Defendants (Myers, Steven) (Entered: 04/25/2019) |
2019-04-25 | 6 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Steven) (Entered: 04/25/2019) |
2019-04-25 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's unopposed 6 motion for extension of time. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file a response to the complaint on or before May 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 25, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 04/25/2019) |
2019-04-25 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to Complaint due by 5/6/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/28/2019) |
2019-05-06 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Myers, Steven) (Entered: 05/06/2019) |
2019-05-06 | | MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before May 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 6, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 05/06/2019) |
2019-05-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/17/2019. (zcal) (Entered: 05/07/2019) |
2019-05-08 | 8 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 05/08/2019) |
2019-05-08 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' 8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before May 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 8, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 05/08/2019) |
2019-05-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/22/2019. (zcal) (Entered: 05/09/2019) |
2019-05-22 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Myers, Steven) (Entered: 05/22/2019) |
2019-05-23 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before June 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 23, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 05/23/2019) |
2019-05-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/21/2019. (zcal) (Entered: 05/23/2019) |
2019-06-21 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Myers, Steven) (Entered: 06/21/2019) |
2019-06-21 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before September 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 21, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 06/21/2019) |
2019-06-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/6/2019. (zcal) (Entered: 06/24/2019) |
2019-09-06 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 09/06/2019) |
2019-09-06 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before November 8, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 6, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 09/06/2019) |
2019-10-17 | 12 | NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Kaiser Creighton on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 10/17/2019) |
2019-10-21 | 13 | NOTICE of Appearance by Emma Lewis on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Lewis, Emma) (Main Document 13 replaced on 10/22/2019) (ztth). (Main Document 13 replaced on 10/22/2019) (ztth). (Entered: 10/21/2019) |
2019-10-22 | 14 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney Cerissa Cafasso terminated. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/22/2019) |
2019-11-08 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Lewis, Emma) (Entered: 11/08/2019) |
2019-11-12 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before January 7, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 12, 2019. (lcdlf2) Modified on 11/12/2019 to correct deadline year (zcal). (Entered: 11/12/2019) |
2019-11-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 11/12/2019) |
2020-01-07 | 16 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Lewis, Emma) (Entered: 01/07/2020) |
2020-01-07 | | MINUTE ORDER dismissing this case without prejudice in light of the plaintiff's 16 Stipulation of Dismissal. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 7, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 01/07/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |