Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-28 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6028839) filed by Rina Hernandez, Project South. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons - ICE, # 3 Summons - USCIS, # 4 Exhibit A - J&A for Berks & Stewart, # 5 Exhibit B - ICE Death Notification, # 6 Exhibit C - May 1, 2018 FOIA Request to ICE, # 7 Exhibit D - May 2, 2018 ICE Ack Ltr, # 8 Exhibit E - May 2, 2018 ICE EP Denial, # 9 Exhibit F - USCIS Initial Response, # 10 Exhibit G - ICE EP App Ack Ltr, # 11 Exhibit H - ICE EP App Denial, # 12 Exhibit I - EP App Ltr to USCIS, # 13 Exhibit J - USCIS EP App Denial, # 14 Exhibit K - ICE Status Check as of 3.28.19, # 15 Exhibit L - USCIS Status Check as of 3.28.19, # 16 Exhibit M - USCIS Status Check as of 3.1.19)(Free, R.) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/29/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 03/28/2019) |
2019-03-29 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019) |
2019-03-29 | 2 | SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019) |
2019-03-29 | 3 | ERRATA by RINA HERNANDEZ, PROJECT SOUTH 1 Complaint,,, filed by RINA HERNANDEZ, PROJECT SOUTH. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Complaint -Corrected Signature Block)(Free, R.) (Entered: 03/29/2019) |
2019-05-06 | 4 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Clark, Denise) (Entered: 05/06/2019) |
2019-05-08 | 5 | ORDER: Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before May 22, 2019. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/08/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 05/08/2019) |
2019-05-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/22/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 05/08/2019) |
2019-05-22 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 05/22/2019) |
2019-05-29 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file their next Joint Status Report by June 21, 2019, which updates the court on the status of Defendants' search and production efforts. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/29/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 05/29/2019) |
2019-05-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/21/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 05/29/2019) |
2019-05-29 | 7 | ORDER: Having considered 6 the Joint Meet and Confer Statement, the court sets the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Counts I and II shall be filed on or before June 17, 2019; Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and, if any, Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment as to Counts I and II shall be filed on or before July 8, 2019; Plaintiffs' Reply to its Motion for Summary Judgment and, if any, Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before July 15, 2019; and Defendants' Reply to its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, if any, shall be filed on or before July 22, 2019. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/29/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 05/29/2019) |
2019-05-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Counts I and II due by 6/17/2019. Defendants' Opposition and Cross Motion due by 7/8/2019. Plaintiffs' Reply and Opposition due by 7/15/2019. Defendants' Reply due by 7/22/2019.(zjd) (Entered: 05/30/2019) |
2019-06-17 | 8 | NOTICE re Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by RINA HERNANDEZ, PROJECT SOUTH re 6 Status Report (Free, R.) (Entered: 06/17/2019) |
2019-06-18 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by August 19, 2019, which updates the court on search and production efforts. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/18/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/18/2019) |
2019-06-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/19/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 06/18/2019) |
2019-06-24 | | Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Amit P. Mehta is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 06/24/2019) |
2019-08-19 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 08/19/2019) |
2019-08-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a subsequent Joint Status Report by September 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 22, 2019. (lccjn2) (Entered: 08/22/2019) |
2019-08-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 9/3/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 08/25/2019) |
2019-09-03 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 09/03/2019) |
2019-09-04 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by September 24. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 4, 2019. (lccjn2) (Entered: 09/04/2019) |
2019-09-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 9/24/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 09/05/2019) |
2019-09-24 | 11 | STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 09/24/2019) |
2019-09-30 | 12 | SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 30, 2019. (lccjn2) (Entered: 09/30/2019) |
2019-11-06 | 13 | Consent MOTION to Vacate Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 11/06/2019) |
2019-11-07 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendants' 13 Consent Motion to Vacate Briefing Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. The Court's 12 Scheduling Order is VACATED. It is further ORDERED that the Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by January 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 7, 2019. (lccjn2) (Entered: 11/07/2019) |
2019-11-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/10/2020. (mac) (Entered: 11/07/2019) |
2019-11-27 | 14 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Michelle D. Jackson on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Denise M. Clark (Jackson, Michelle) (Entered: 11/27/2019) |
2020-01-10 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Michelle) (Entered: 01/10/2020) |
2020-01-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by February 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 10, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 01/10/2020) |
2020-01-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 01/15/2020) |
2020-02-25 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Michelle) (Entered: 02/25/2020) |
2020-02-26 | 17 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Jackson, Michelle) (Entered: 02/26/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |