Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-29 | 1 | COMPLAINT against NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6029904) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Rule 26.1 Certificate)(Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 03/29/2019) |
2019-03-29 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/01/2019) |
2019-04-01 | | Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/01/2019) |
2019-04-01 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 04/01/2019) |
2019-05-02 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 05/02/2019) |
2019-05-02 | 5 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 05/02/2019) |
2019-05-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's Consent 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File is GRANTED, and that Defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond on or before June 3, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/2/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 05/02/2019) |
2019-05-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/3/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 05/03/2019) |
2019-05-31 | 6 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 05/31/2019) |
2019-06-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) Defendant's Consent 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File is GRANTED; (2) Defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond on or before June 19, 2019; (3) The parties shall file a joint status report by that date. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/3/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 06/03/2019) |
2019-06-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 6/19/2019. Joint Status Report due by 6/19/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 06/03/2019) |
2019-06-19 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH.(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 06/19/2019) |
2019-06-19 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 06/19/2019) |
2019-06-20 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 8 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file another joint status report by July 23, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/20/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 06/20/2019) |
2019-06-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/23/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 06/21/2019) |
2019-07-23 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC CITIZEN. (Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 07/23/2019) |
2019-07-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 9 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file another joint status report by September 23, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/23/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 07/23/2019) |
2019-07-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/23/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 07/24/2019) |
2019-09-17 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC CITIZEN. (Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 09/17/2019) |
2019-09-18 | | MINUTE ORDER ADOPTING the parties' 10 Joint Status Report. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a further joint status report by November 22, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/18/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/18/2019) |
2019-09-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/22/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 09/18/2019) |
2019-11-22 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 11/22/2019) |
2019-11-25 | | MINUTE ORDER ADOPTING the parties' 11 Joint Status Report. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a further joint status report by December 23, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/25/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 11/25/2019) |
2019-11-25 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/23/2019. (zcal) (Entered: 11/25/2019) |
2019-12-23 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC CITIZEN. (Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 12/23/2019) |
2020-01-02 | | MINUTE ORDER ADOPTING the parties' 12 Joint Status Report. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a further joint status report by January 23, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/2/2020. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 01/02/2020) |
2020-01-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/23/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 01/06/2020) |
2020-01-23 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 01/23/2020) |
2020-01-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 13 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by February 27, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/24/2020. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 01/24/2020) |
2020-01-24 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/27/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 01/24/2020) |
2020-02-27 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 02/27/2020) |
2020-03-20 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 14 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall submit a futher joint status report by March 30, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/20/2020. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 03/20/2020) |
2020-03-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/30/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 03/20/2020) |
2020-03-30 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 03/30/2020) |
2020-03-31 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 15 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall submit a further joint status report by April 30, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/31/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 03/31/2020) |
2020-03-31 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/30/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 03/31/2020) |
2020-04-30 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 04/30/2020) |
2020-05-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 16 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they submit a further joint status report by June 30, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/1/2020. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 05/01/2020) |
2020-05-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/30/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 05/01/2020) |
2020-06-30 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 06/30/2020) |
2020-07-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 17 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by September 16, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/1/2020. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 07/01/2020) |
2020-07-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/16/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 07/01/2020) |
2020-09-15 | 18 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 09/15/2020) |
2020-09-16 | | MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 18 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file their joint status report by September 23, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/16/2020. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/16/2020) |
2020-09-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/23/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 09/16/2020) |
2020-09-23 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 09/23/2020) |
2020-09-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 19 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by November 5, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/23/2020. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/23/2020) |
2020-09-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/5/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 09/23/2020) |
2020-11-05 | 20 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 11/05/2020) |
2020-11-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 20 Stipulation, the Court ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/06/2020. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 11/06/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |