Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-05-28 | 1 | COMPLAINT against Sonny Perdue, United States Forest Service (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6708610)Attorney Courtney Renee McVean added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(McVean, Courtney) (Entered: 05/28/2019) |
2019-05-28 | 2 | Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) (Entered: 05/28/2019) |
2019-05-28 | 3 | SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, ) (Entered: 05/28/2019) |
2019-05-29 | 4 | MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01510-STV. (athom, ) (Entered: 05/29/2019) |
2019-05-29 | 5 | Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, ) (Entered: 05/29/2019) |
2019-05-29 | 6 | ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; Consent Form due by 7/31/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. On or before August 7, 2019, the parties shall file a joint proposed schedulingorder in the form required pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/29/19. (morti, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019) |
2019-06-13 | 7 | SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) George Ervin Perdue, III served on 6/3/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (McVean, Courtney) Modified on 7/8/2019 to correct FOIA deadline (jgonz, ). (Entered: 06/13/2019) |
2019-06-13 | 8 | SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) United States Forest Service served on 6/3/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (McVean, Courtney) Modified on 7/8/2019 to correct FOIA deadline (jgonz, ). (Entered: 06/13/2019) |
2019-06-14 | 9 | SUMMONS issued by Clerk for George Perdue III. (Attachments: # 1 Summons for Jessie K. Liu, # 2 Summons for William Barr) (rvill, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019) |
2019-07-03 | 10 | STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants United States Forest Service, George Ervin Perdue, III. United States Forest Service answer due 7/24/2019; George Ervin Perdue, III answer due 7/24/2019. (Ross, Katherine) (Entered: 07/03/2019) |
2019-07-24 | 11 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint, by Defendants George Ervin Perdue, III, United States Forest Service. (Ross, Katherine) (Entered: 07/24/2019) |
2019-07-25 | 12 | ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (the "Motion"). According to the Motion, the parties have reached a settlement in principle. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2019 10:30 AM is VACATED. On or before 8/23/2019, the parties shall file dismissal papers or a report regarding the status of settlement. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/25/2019. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, ) (Entered: 07/25/2019) |
2019-08-12 | 13 | STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Friends of Animals. (McVean, Courtney) (Entered: 08/12/2019) |
2019-08-12 | 14 | Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 8/12/2019. Text Only Entry (jgonz, ) (Entered: 08/13/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |