Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-05-28 | 1 | COMPLAINT against HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6147807) filed by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Golden, Deborah) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/30/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 05/28/2019) |
2019-05-30 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019) |
2019-05-30 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019) |
2019-06-20 | 3 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/31/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/30/2019. (Golden, Deborah) Modified on 6/21/2019 to correct serve/answer due date (jf). (Entered: 06/20/2019) |
2019-06-20 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/31/2019. (Golden, Deborah) Modified on 6/21/2019 to correct serve/answer due date (jf). (Entered: 06/20/2019) |
2019-06-20 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES served on 5/31/2019 (Golden, Deborah) Modified on 6/21/2019 to correct serve/answer due date (jf). (Entered: 06/20/2019) |
2019-06-24 | | Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Amy Berman Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 06/24/2019) |
2019-06-26 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 06/26/2019) |
2019-07-01 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/01/2019) |
2019-08-13 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) appear to be inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before September 11, 2019. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 13, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 08/13/2019) |
2019-08-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/11/2019 (mac) (Entered: 08/14/2019) |
2019-09-11 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/11/2019) |
2019-09-12 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before October 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 12, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 09/12/2019) |
2019-09-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/11/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 09/12/2019) |
2019-09-26 | 9 | NOTICE of Change of Address by Deborah Maxine Golden (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 09/26/2019) |
2019-10-10 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 10/10/2019) |
2019-10-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before November 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 15, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 10/15/2019) |
2019-11-29 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 11/29/2019) |
2019-12-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before January 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 2, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 12/02/2019) |
2019-12-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/15/2020. (mac) (Entered: 12/02/2019) |
2019-12-18 | 12 | NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Lucas Marshall on behalf of HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER (Marshall, Daniel) (Entered: 12/18/2019) |
2020-01-14 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 01/14/2020) |
2020-01-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before February 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 15, 2020. (lccjn1) (Entered: 01/15/2020) |
2020-01-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/17/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 01/15/2020) |
2020-02-18 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 02/18/2020) |
2020-02-18 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before March 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 18, 2020. (lccjn1) (Entered: 02/18/2020) |
2020-02-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/17/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 02/19/2020) |
2020-03-17 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 03/17/2020) |
2020-03-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before April 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 17, 2020. (lccjn1) (Entered: 03/17/2020) |
2020-03-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/16/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/18/2020) |
2020-04-16 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 04/16/2020) |
2020-04-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that on or before May 18, 2020, the Parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 17, 2020. (lccjn1) (Entered: 04/17/2020) |
2020-04-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/18/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/26/2020) |
2020-05-05 | 17 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 05/05/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |