Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-05-28 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE filed by FRANCISCO GARZA VARGAS. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6148131 (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Huang, Xiaosheng) # 2 Civil Cover Sheet (zef, ). Modified text and order of documents on 6/3/2019 (zef, ). (Entered: 05/28/2019) |
2019-05-28 | 2 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eva Garcia-Mendoza, :Firm- Law Offices of Eva Garcia-Mendoza, :Address- 501 S 7th St., Las Vegas, NV 89101. Phone No. - 702-384-8484. Fax No. - 702-384-0207 Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by FRANCISCO GARZA VARGAS (Huang, Xiaosheng) (Entered: 05/28/2019) |
2019-05-28 | 3 | AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE filed by FRANCISCO GARZA VARGAS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huang, Xiaosheng) Modified event title on 6/4/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 05/28/2019) |
2019-06-03 | | Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/03/2019) |
2019-06-03 | 4 | SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/03/2019) |
2019-06-05 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Eva Garcia-Mendoza is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/5/2019. (lctjk3) (Entered: 06/05/2019) |
2019-06-28 | 5 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FRANCISCO GARZA VARGAS of Summons and Complaint . (Mendoza, Eva) (Entered: 06/28/2019) |
2019-07-15 | 6 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FRANCISCO GARZA VARGAS by mail to State Department . (Mendoza, Eva) (Entered: 07/15/2019) |
2019-07-26 | 7 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FRANCISCO GARZA VARGAS to Civil Process Clerk . (Mendoza, Eva) (Entered: 07/26/2019) |
2019-08-08 | 8 | NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/08/2019) |
2019-08-09 | 9 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 7/23/2019 (Mendoza, Eva) (Entered: 08/09/2019) |
2019-08-15 | 10 | NOTICE of Change of Address by Eva Garcia Mendoza (Mendoza, Eva) (Entered: 08/15/2019) |
2019-08-26 | 11 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/26/2019) |
2019-08-26 | | MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, Defendant's 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's 3 Amended Complaint by September 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/26/2019. (lctjk3) (Entered: 08/26/2019) |
2019-09-04 | 12 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 8/28/2019 . (Mendoza, Eva); Modified event and text on 9/5/2019 (ztth). (Entered: 09/04/2019) |
2019-09-05 | 13 | ERRATA re 12 by FRANCISCO GARZA VARGAS . (Mendoza, Eva); Modified docket entry relationship on 9/6/2019 (ztth). Modified to add link on 9/6/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 09/05/2019) |
2019-09-26 | 14 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/26/2019) |
2019-10-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by October 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/1/2019. (lctjk3) (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-29 | 15 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Parties' Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/29/2019) |
2019-10-30 | | MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, Defendant's 15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by December 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/30/2019. (lctjk3) (Entered: 10/30/2019) |
2019-12-03 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/03/2019) |
2019-12-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall provide Plaintiff with a draft Vaughn index by January 31, 2020. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment by March 10, 2020, Plaintiff shall file his Opposition by April 10, 2020, and Defendants shall file their Reply in support of their motion for summary judgment by April 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/5/2019. (lctjk3) (Entered: 12/05/2019) |
2020-03-05 | 17 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/05/2020) |
2020-03-06 | | MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, Defendant's 17 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment by April 14, 2020; Plaintiff shall file his Opposition by May 15, 2020, and Defendant shall file its Reply in support of its motion for summary judgment by June 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/6/2020. (lctjk3) (Entered: 03/06/2020) |
2020-04-14 | 18 | NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/14/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |