Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-05-28 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6148144) filed by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Ban, Victor) (Entered: 05/28/2019) |
2019-06-03 | | Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/03/2019) |
2019-06-03 | 2 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/03/2019) |
2019-06-03 | 3 | STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are directed to read and strictly comply with the attached Order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/3/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/03/2019) |
2019-06-05 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/3/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/3/2019. (Ban, Victor) (Entered: 06/05/2019) |
2019-06-05 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/03/2019. (Ban, Victor) (Entered: 06/05/2019) |
2019-06-05 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/3/2019 (Ban, Victor) (Entered: 06/05/2019) |
2019-06-05 | 7 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE filed by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Ban, Victor) (Entered: 06/05/2019) |
2019-06-06 | 8 | SUMMONS (1) Re-Issued Electronically as to U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent) (tth) Modified text on 6/12/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 06/06/2019) |
2019-06-06 | 9 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE served on 6/6/2019 (Ban, Victor) (Entered: 06/06/2019) |
2019-06-24 | 10 | NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of All Defendants (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/24/2019) |
2019-07-01 | 11 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/01/2019) |
2019-07-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of the Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to the Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by the Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before August 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/2/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 07/02/2019) |
2019-07-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/2/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 07/02/2019) |
2019-08-02 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/02/2019) |
2019-08-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that they shall file another Joint Status Report by September 6, 2019, describing the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request and proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The schedule should address the anticipated number of documents responsive to the Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by the Plaintiff, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/2/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 08/02/2019) |
2019-08-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/6/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 08/02/2019) |
2019-09-06 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ban, Victor) (Entered: 09/06/2019) |
2019-09-06 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before November 6, 2019. The report will address the status of the parties' negotiations regarding the processing rate and production schedule going forward. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/6/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 09/06/2019) |
2019-09-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/6/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 09/09/2019) |
2019-09-11 | 14 | NOTICE of Appearance by Blake Berkeley Hulnick on behalf of HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER (Hulnick, Blake) (Entered: 09/11/2019) |
2019-10-14 | 15 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. Attorney Victor Duen-Li Ban terminated. (Ban, Victor) (Entered: 10/14/2019) |
2019-11-06 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/06/2019) |
2019-11-07 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report every 90 days advising the Court on the progress of the Defendants' productions to Plaintiff. The next Joint Status Report shall be due on or before February 4, 2020. The parties shall continue to file Joint Status Reports every 90 days thereafter until otherwise ordered by the Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/7/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 11/07/2019) |
2019-11-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/4/2020, and every 90 days thereafter. (tg) (Entered: 11/07/2019) |
2020-01-23 | 17 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Robert Aaron Caplen on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE Substituting for attorney Damon W. Taaffe (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 01/23/2020) |
2020-02-04 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 02/04/2020) |
2020-05-04 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 05/04/2020) |
2020-08-03 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 08/03/2020) |
2020-08-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before November 2, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/10/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 08/10/2020) |
2020-08-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/2/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 08/10/2020) |
2020-11-02 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 11/02/2020) |
2021-01-29 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 01/29/2021) |
2021-04-29 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 04/29/2021) |
2021-04-29 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 23 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report by May 14, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/29/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 04/29/2021) |
2021-04-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/14/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 04/29/2021) |
2021-05-04 | 24 | NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Paige Carroll on behalf of HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER (Carroll, Tyler) (Entered: 05/04/2021) |
2021-05-12 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 05/12/2021) |
2021-05-12 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 25 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report by June 11, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/12/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 05/12/2021) |
2021-05-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/11/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 05/12/2021) |
2021-06-10 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 06/10/2021) |
2021-06-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 26 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another Joint Status Report by July 9, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/10/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/10/2021) |
2021-06-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/9/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 06/10/2021) |
2021-07-01 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2021) |
2021-07-01 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 27 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another Joint Status Report by August 13, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/1/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 07/01/2021) |
2021-07-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/13/2021. (zhmc) (Entered: 07/01/2021) |
2021-08-13 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Tyler) (Entered: 08/13/2021) |
2021-08-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 28 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another Joint Status Report by Nov. 11, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/16/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 08/16/2021) |
2021-08-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/11/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 08/16/2021) |
2021-11-11 | 29 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Tyler) (Entered: 11/11/2021) |
2021-11-12 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Parties' 29 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties file another Joint Status Report on or before February 14, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/12/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 11/12/2021) |
2021-11-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/14/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 11/12/2021) |
2021-11-23 | 30 | NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Duffey on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 11/23/2021) |
2022-02-14 | 31 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hulnick, Blake) (Entered: 02/14/2022) |
2022-02-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 31 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file another Joint Status Report on or before May 10, 2022. The parties are also ORDERED to appear for a telephonic status conference on May 13, 2022, at 2 p.m. The parties will be emailed dial-in information. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/14/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 02/14/2022) |
2022-02-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/10/2022. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/13/2022 at 2:00 PM before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 02/15/2022) |
2022-05-10 | 32 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hulnick, Blake) (Entered: 05/10/2022) |
2022-05-13 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/13/2022. Joint status report indicating that the case is resolved or joint proposed scheduling order for summary judgment briefing due by 7/13/2022. (Court Reporter: Lisa Edwards.) (hmc) (Entered: 05/13/2022) |
2022-05-27 | 33 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. Attorney Tyler Paige Carroll terminated. (Carroll, Tyler) (Entered: 05/27/2022) |
2022-07-13 | 34 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hulnick, Blake) (Entered: 07/13/2022) |
2022-07-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Parties' 34 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file its Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by August 29, 2022. Defendants shall file their opposition by September 28, 2022. Plaintiff's reply, if any, shall be filed by October 13, 2022. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed by October 28, 2022. The parties shall promptly notify the Court if they reach agreement on the issue of fees and costs. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/14/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 07/14/2022) |
2022-07-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs due by 8/29/2022. Opposition due by 9/28/2022. Replies due by 10/13/2022 and 10/28/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 07/14/2022) |
2022-08-29 | 35 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 08/29/2022) |
2022-08-29 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the 35 Stipulation of Dismissal, this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Clerk of Court shall close this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/29/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 08/29/2022) |
Hide Docket Events |