Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-06-18 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6195044) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Lai, Erica) (Entered: 06/18/2019) |
2019-06-18 | | Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019) |
2019-06-18 | 2 | SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019) |
2019-06-18 | 3 | STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/18/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019) |
2019-06-18 | 4 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Lai, Erica) (Entered: 06/18/2019) |
2019-07-12 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of All Defendants (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/12/2019) |
2019-07-26 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle C. Morello on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Morello, Danielle) (Entered: 07/26/2019) |
2019-07-30 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa H. Maxman on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Maxman, Melissa) (Entered: 07/30/2019) |
2019-07-30 | 8 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/30/2019) |
2019-07-30 | 9 | NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Alexander McGrath on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/31/2019) (ztd). (Entered: 07/30/2019) |
2019-07-31 | 10 | NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of All Defendants (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/31/2019) |
2019-08-01 | 11 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/1/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/31/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/24/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 6/24/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 6/24/2019; U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 6/24/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lai, Erica) (Entered: 08/01/2019) |
2019-08-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Defendants' unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer the complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall file an answer to the complaint on or before August 14, 2019, and the parties shall file a joint status report apprising the Court of the status of plaintiff's request on or before September 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/02/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 08/02/2019) |
2019-08-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall file an answer to the complaint on or before 8/14/2019; Joint Status Report due by 9/5/2019. (kt) (Entered: 08/02/2019) |
2019-08-14 | 12 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/14/2019) |
2019-08-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on September 19, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/21/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 08/21/2019) |
2019-08-21 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2019, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 08/21/2019) |
2019-09-05 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Lai, Erica) (Entered: 09/05/2019) |
2019-09-16 | 14 | NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald F. Wick on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wick, Ronald) (Entered: 09/16/2019) |
2019-09-19 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 9/19/2019. For the reasons stated on the record, the parties shall file a joint status report in 30 days. Within 3 weeks, DHS shall inform Plaintiff as to a proposed production schedule and page count. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook) (kt) (Entered: 09/19/2019) |
2019-09-24 | 15 | TRANSCRIPT OF INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE before Judge Randolph D. Moss held on September 19, 2019. Page Numbers: 1 - 16. Date of Issuance: September 24, 2019. Court Reporter: Jeff Hook. Telephone number: 202-354-3373. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the c ourt reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2019.(Hook, Jeff) (Entered: 09/24/2019) |
2019-10-21 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/21/2019) |
2019-10-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 16 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before December 20, 2019. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall file a status report that furnishes the Court with details regarding their respective FOIA processing burdens on or before November 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/21/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 10/22/2019) |
2019-10-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Status Report due by 12/20/2019. (kt) (Entered: 10/23/2019) |
2019-11-06 | 17 | STATUS REPORT Regarding Defendants' Processing Burdens and Staffing by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/06/2019) |
2019-12-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' status report regarding FOIA processing burdens and staffing, Dkt. 17, Defendants are hereby ORDERED to include a section in the upcoming joint status report which apprises the Court as to any updates regarding the serious FOIA staffing deficiency at ICE and the agency's efforts, if any, to remedy that deficiency. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/13/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019) |
2019-12-20 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/20/2019) |
2020-01-21 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/21/2020) |
2020-01-21 | 20 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brenda A. Gonzalez on behalf of U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT Substituting for attorney Damon Taaffe (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 01/21/2020) |
2020-01-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 17, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 01/22/2020. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 01/22/2020) |
2020-01-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the terms of the Court's revised standing order, which is available on the Court's website. Click for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 01/23/2020. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020) |
2020-02-20 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 02/20/2020) |
2020-02-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 21, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before March 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 02/21/2020. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 02/21/2020) |
2020-03-23 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 03/23/2020) |
2020-03-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 22, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before April 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 03/24/2020. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 03/24/2020) |
2020-04-22 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 04/22/2020) |
2020-04-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 23, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before May 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 04/27/2020. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020) |
2020-05-22 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 05/22/2020) |
2020-05-26 | 25 | NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Tilghman on behalf of U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2020) |
2020-05-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 24, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before June 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 05/26/2020. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020) |
2020-05-29 | 26 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney Danielle C. Morello terminated. (Morello, Danielle) (Entered: 05/29/2020) |
2020-06-22 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2020) |
2020-06-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 27, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before July 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 06/23/2020. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 06/23/2020) |
2020-07-22 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2020) |
2020-07-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 28 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before August 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/23/2020. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 07/23/2020) |
2020-08-21 | 29 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2020) |
2020-08-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 29 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before September 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/21/20. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 08/21/2020) |
2020-09-21 | 30 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2020) |
2020-09-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 30 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before October 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/22/2020. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 09/22/2020) |
2020-10-21 | 31 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2020) |
2020-10-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 31 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before November 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/22/2020. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 10/22/2020) |
2020-11-20 | 32 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 11/20/2020) |
2020-11-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 32 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before December 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/23/2020. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 11/23/2020) |
2020-12-21 | 33 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 12/21/2020) |
2020-12-21 | 34 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. Attorney Brenda A. Gonzalez-Horowitz terminated. (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 12/21/2020) |
2020-12-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 33 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before January 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/22/2020. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 12/22/2020) |
2021-01-19 | 35 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2021) |
2021-01-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 35 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 18, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/21/2021. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 01/21/2021) |
2021-02-18 | 36 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 02/18/2021) |
2021-02-19 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 36 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before March 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/19/2021. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 02/19/2021) |
2021-03-22 | 37 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2021) |
2021-03-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 37 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before April 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/22/2021. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 03/22/2021) |
2021-04-21 | 38 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2021) |
2021-04-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 38 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before May 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/23/2021. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 04/23/2021) |
2021-04-29 | 39 | NOTICE of Appearance by Hart W. Wood on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart) (Main Document 39 replaced on 4/30/2021) (ztd). (Entered: 04/29/2021) |
2021-04-29 | 40 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney Daniel Alexander McGrath terminated. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 04/29/2021) |
2021-05-19 | 41 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney Ronald F. Wick; Erica Courtney Lai and Melissa H. Maxman terminated. (Lai, Erica) (Entered: 05/19/2021) |
2021-05-21 | 42 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2021) |
2021-05-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 42 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before June 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/21/2021. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 05/21/2021) |
2021-06-21 | 43 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 06/21/2021) |
2021-06-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 43 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before July 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/21/2021. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 06/21/2021) |
2021-07-21 | 44 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 07/21/2021) |
2021-07-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 44 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before August 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/27/2021. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 07/27/2021) |
2021-08-20 | 45 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 08/20/2021) |
2021-08-20 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, Dkt. 45 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before September 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/20/2021. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 08/20/2021) |
2021-09-22 | 46 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 09/22/2021) |
2021-09-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 46 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before November 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/22/2021. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 09/22/2021) |
2021-11-22 | 47 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2021) |
2021-11-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 47 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before January 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/24/2021. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 11/24/2021) |
2022-01-21 | 48 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 01/21/2022) |
2022-01-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 48 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before March 22, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/22/2022. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 01/22/2022) |
2022-03-22 | 49 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2022) |
2022-03-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 49 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before June 20, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/22/2022. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 03/22/2022) |
2022-06-17 | 50 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 06/17/2022) |
2022-06-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 50 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before August 19, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/22/2022. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 06/22/2022) |
2022-08-19 | 51 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 08/19/2022) |
2022-08-19 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, Dkt. 51 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by October 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/19/2022. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 08/19/2022) |
2022-09-02 | 52 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Michael A. Tilghman, II (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 09/02/2022) |
2022-10-18 | 53 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 10/18/2022) |
2022-10-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties Joint Status Report, Dkt. 53 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before December 20, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/18/2022. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 10/18/2022) |
2022-12-20 | 54 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 12/20/2022) |
2022-12-20 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, Dkt. 54 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before March 3, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/20/2022. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 12/20/2022) |
2023-03-03 | 55 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 03/03/2023) |
2023-03-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, Dkt. 55 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before June 2, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/3/2023. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 03/03/2023) |
2023-06-02 | 56 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 06/02/2023) |
2023-06-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. [56-1], it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before September 7, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/6/2023. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 06/06/2023) |
2023-07-11 | 57 | NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Stoneman on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Stoneman, Taylor) (Main Document 57 replaced on 7/13/2023) (zjm). (Entered: 07/11/2023) |
2023-07-13 | 58 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney Hart W. Wood terminated. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 07/13/2023) |
2023-09-07 | 59 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 09/07/2023) |
2023-09-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, Dkt. 59 , the Court hereby ORDERS the parties file a further joint status report on or before December 7, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/11/23. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 09/11/2023) |
2023-12-07 | 60 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 12/07/2023) |
2023-12-08 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, Dkt. 60 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties submit a further joint status report on or before March 7, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/8/23. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 12/08/2023) |
2024-03-07 | 61 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 03/07/2024) |
2024-03-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, Dkt. 61 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties submit a further joint status report on or before September 6, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/11/24. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 03/11/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |