Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-10-01 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6408612) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/2/2019) (zeg). (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-01 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-02 | | Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zeg) (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-10-02 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-10-04 | 4 | MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Daniel McGrath)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 10/04/2019) |
2019-10-07 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Charles Abbuhl on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 10/07/2019) |
2019-10-11 | 6 | Memorandum in opposition to re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Eric Stein)(Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 10/11/2019) |
2019-10-17 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Kaiser Creighton on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 10/17/2019) |
2019-10-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to attend a telephonic conference on Thursday, October 17, 2019 at 4:00 PM. Dial-in information will be provided separately. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/17/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 10/17/2019) |
2019-10-17 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 4:00 PM before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj) (Entered: 10/17/2019) |
2019-10-17 | | Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/17/2019. The parties are to appear for a Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2019 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira) (lsj) (Entered: 10/17/2019) |
2019-10-18 | 8 | TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE before Judge Christopher R. Cooper held on October 17, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-7. Date of Issuance:October 18, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa A. Moreira, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (202) 354-3187, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/8/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2020.(Moreira, Lisa) (Entered: 10/18/2019) |
2019-10-18 | 9 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 10/18/2019) |
2019-10-22 | 10 | NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Shapiro on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/22/2019) |
2019-10-23 | 11 | SURREPLY to re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) Modified on 10/23/2019 (ztd). Modified on 11/18/2019 to reinstate document (jf). (Entered: 10/23/2019) |
2019-10-23 | | Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/23/2019. Oral arguments submitted on Plaintiff's Motion 4 for Preliminary Injunction. Forthcoming Order. (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira) (lsj) (Entered: 10/23/2019) |
2019-10-23 | | ENTERED IN ERROR DOCUMENT REINSTATED.....NOTICE OF ERROR re 11 Surreply; emailed to joshua.abbuhl@usdoj.gov, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. You must file a Motion for Leave to file a Surreply. The surreply must be attached as an exhibit to the motion. (ztd, ) Modified on 11/18/2019 (jf). (Entered: 10/23/2019) |
2019-10-24 | 12 | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-3058. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 10/24/2019) |
2019-10-25 | 13 | TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge Christopher R. Cooper held on October 23, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-34. Date of Issuance:October 25, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa A. Moreira, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (202) 354-3187, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2020.(Moreira, Lisa) (Entered: 10/25/2019) |
2019-10-25 | 14 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/4/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/3/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/10/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 10/10/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2019) |
2019-10-25 | 15 | ORDER granting in part 4 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/25/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 10/25/2019) |
2019-10-25 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement (Joint Status Report) due by 10/30/2019. Further Joint Status Report due by 11/25/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 10/25/2019) |
2019-10-30 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 10/30/2019) |
2019-11-01 | 17 | OPINION and ORDER re: 16 Joint Status Report. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/1/2019. (lccrc3) Modified on 11/1/2019 (lsj). (Entered: 11/01/2019) |
2019-11-04 | 18 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 11/04/2019) |
2019-11-25 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) Modified date filed due to technical cmecf issues on 11/26/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 11/26/2019) |
2019-11-26 | 20 | Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 11/26/2019) |
2019-11-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a Status Conference on Tuesday, December 3, 2019 at 10AM in Courtroom 27A. The parties should be prepared to discuss the issues raised in their 19 November 25 Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/27/2019. (lccrc3) Modified to amend year on 12/2/2019 (lsj). (Entered: 11/27/2019) |
2019-11-27 | 21 | Consent MOTION to Continue Hearing to be Rescheduled by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Shapiro, Elizabeth) Modified event title on 12/2/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 11/27/2019) |
2019-12-02 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the Government's 21 Consent Motion to Reschedule Hearing. It is hereby ORDERED that the December 3, 2019 Status Conference shall be held at 11:30AM in Courtroom 27A. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/2/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 12/02/2019) |
2019-12-02 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/3/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj) (Entered: 12/02/2019) |
2019-12-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: Defendant is hereby ORDERED to file the State Department's search declaration with the Court on or before December 9, 2019. The Court will take the parties' current requests under advisement pending review of the declaration. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/3/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 12/03/2019) |
2019-12-03 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper: Status Conference held on 12/3/2019. (Court Reporter Lisa Moreira.) (hmc) (Entered: 12/03/2019) |
2019-12-04 | 22 | TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS HEARING before Judge Christopher R. Cooper held on December 3, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-23. Date of Issuance:December 4, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa A. Moreira, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (202) 354-3187, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/4/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/3/2020.(Moreira, Lisa) (Entered: 12/04/2019) |
2019-12-09 | 23 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file draft search declaration by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 12/09/2019) |
2019-12-09 | 24 | RESPONSE re 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file draft search declaration filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 12/09/2019) |
2019-12-09 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Search Declaration. The Declaration shall be filed on or before Wednesday, December 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/9/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 12/09/2019) |
2019-12-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Declaration due by 12/11/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 12/10/2019) |
2019-12-11 | 25 | NOTICE of Filing of Search Declaration by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Eric Stein)(Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 12/11/2019) |
2019-12-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: Pending receipt of the State Department's 25 sworn declaration describing its expedited search, the Court deferred ruling at the December 3, 2019 Hearing on two outstanding disputes between the parties described in their 19 Joint Status Report. Having now reviewed that declaration, the Court finds that the Department has not adequately justified why its Executive Secretariat used a cut-off date of August 2, 2019 in conducting the searches of the Department's highest offices. First, it has not explained what the "exploratory" searches purportedly conducted on that date entailed or how those searches complied with the Department's obligation under FOIA to search for records created up to the date of its search. Second, an August 2nd search cut off appears inconsistent with the fact that Plaintiff did not seek expedited processing until September 20, 2019, with government counsel's representation on October 17, 2019 that State was "still crafting a general search strategy," Teleconference Tr. at 4, counsel's representation on October 23, 2019 that State was "doing all these searches since last week," P.I. Mot. Hr'g Tr. at 20, and with other Department components' use of October 18th as the cut-off date, see Stein Decl. paras. 39, 42, 46, 49. As a result, the Court hereby ORDERS the State Department to supplement the expedited portion of the search using at least October 18, 2019 as the cut-off date for all components conducting the search. It is further ORDERED that State shall produce all non-exempt responsive documents on or before January 8, 2020. In light of this ruling, the Court declines at this time to order expedited processing of the other records sought to be prioritized by Plaintiff, namely (1) informal records reflecting the contents of the President's July 25, 2019 call and (2) communications with two named State Department officials. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/13/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 12/13/2019) |
2019-12-16 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by Friday, January 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/16/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 12/16/2019) |
2019-12-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/10/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 12/17/2019) |
2020-01-10 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 01/10/2020) |
2020-01-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of 26 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by Tuesday, January 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 01/13/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 01/13/2020) |
2020-01-14 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 01/14/2020) |
2020-01-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of 27 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report on or before March 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 01/15/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 01/15/2020) |
2020-01-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/26/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 01/16/2020) |
2020-03-26 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 03/26/2020) |
2020-03-30 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of 28 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before April 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 03/30/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 03/30/2020) |
2020-03-31 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/6/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 03/31/2020) |
2020-04-02 | 29 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 04/02/2020) |
2020-04-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of 29 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further joint status report on or before May 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 04/02/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 04/02/2020) |
2020-05-14 | 30 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 05/14/2020) |
2020-05-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of 30 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further joint status report on or before July 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 05/18/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 05/18/2020) |
2020-05-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/21/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 05/18/2020) |
2020-07-21 | 31 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 07/21/2020) |
2020-07-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of 31 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further joint status report on or before September 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 07/21/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/21/2020) |
2020-07-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/16/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 07/22/2020) |
2020-09-16 | 32 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 09/16/2020) |
2020-09-17 | | STATUS REPORT ORDER: In light of the 32 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report by 10/29/2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/17/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/17/2020) |
2020-10-29 | 33 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 10/29/2020) |
2020-11-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 33 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report on or before 2/5/2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/02/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 11/02/2020) |
2021-02-05 | 34 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 02/05/2021) |
2021-02-08 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 34 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ordered to file a further joint status report on or before April 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 02/08/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 02/08/2021) |
2021-02-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/29/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 02/08/2021) |
2021-04-29 | 35 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 04/29/2021) |
2021-04-29 | 36 | NOTICE of Appearance by Hart W. Wood on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart) (Main Document 36 replaced on 4/30/2021) (ztd). (Entered: 04/29/2021) |
2021-04-29 | 37 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney Daniel Alexander McGrath terminated. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 04/29/2021) |
2021-04-30 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 35 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ordered to file a further joint status report on or before July 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 04/30/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 04/30/2021) |
2021-06-30 | 38 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney Sara Kaiser Creighton terminated. (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 06/30/2021) |
2021-07-15 | 39 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 07/15/2021) |
2021-07-16 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 39 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file a further Joint Status Report on or before October 14, 2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 07/16/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/16/2021) |
2021-08-25 | 40 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sarah M. Colombo, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8691241. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 08/25/2021) |
2021-08-26 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 40 Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah M. Colombo. Counsel is encouraged to complete the application process to become a member of this Court's Bar expeditiously, upon approval of her application for membership to the District of Columbia Bar. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/26/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 08/26/2021) |
2021-09-22 | 41 | NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Colombo on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Colombo, Sarah) (Entered: 09/22/2021) |
2021-10-14 | 42 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 10/14/2021) |
2021-10-19 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 42 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file their next status report on or before January 14, 2022. The parties shall include the number of pages, if any, that Defendant processes in its next two productions (November 11 and December 21, 2021), and the number of pages remaining to be produced. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/19/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 10/19/2021) |
2022-01-14 | 43 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 01/14/2022) |
2022-01-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 43 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further Joint Status Report on or before January 24, 2022. The next report shall indicate whether the parties have reached an agreement on the processing rate for the remaining pages, or absent an agreement, the parties' competing proposals for a processing rate. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/14/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 01/14/2022) |
2022-01-24 | 44 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 01/24/2022) |
2022-01-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 44 Joint Status Report in this case, and the status reports in Case Nos. 19-cv-3387 and 19-cv-3058 which involve the same parties, and considering the parties' competing proposals for a processing rate, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant process the remaining approximately 200 pages of potentially responsive records on the unclassified network by April 29, 2022. "Processing" for purposes of this deadline may exclude any steps associated with obtaining clearances from entities external to the State Department. It is further ORDERED that the parties file a further Joint Status Report on or before May 2, 2022, which shall include an update as to the parties' discussions and next steps regarding the remaining potentially responsive records on the classified network. So Ordered by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/28/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 01/28/2022) |
2022-02-21 | 45 | NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 02/21/2022) |
2022-05-02 | 46 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 05/02/2022) |
2022-05-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 46 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further Joint Status Report on or before July 1, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/4/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 05/04/2022) |
2022-05-31 | 47 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. Attorney Johnny Hillary Walker, III terminated. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 05/31/2022) |
2022-07-01 | 48 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 07/01/2022) |
2022-07-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 48 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further Joint Status Report on or before September 1, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/5/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/05/2022) |
2022-09-01 | 49 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 09/01/2022) |
2022-09-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 49 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further Joint Status Report on or before December 15, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/06/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/06/2022) |
2022-12-15 | 50 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 12/15/2022) |
2022-12-16 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 50 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further Joint Status Report on or before March 2, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/16/22. (lccrc3) (Entered: 12/16/2022) |
2023-03-02 | 51 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 03/02/2023) |
2023-03-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 51 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further Joint Status Report on or before May 31, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 03/03/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 03/03/2023) |
2023-04-18 | 52 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney Sarah Colombo terminated. (Colombo, Sarah) (Entered: 04/18/2023) |
2023-05-31 | 53 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 05/31/2023) |
2023-05-31 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 53 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further Joint Status Report on or before August 31, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 05/31/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 05/31/2023) |
2023-07-11 | 54 | NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Marie Anthony on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 07/11/2023) |
2023-07-13 | 55 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney Hart W. Wood terminated. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 07/13/2023) |
2023-07-13 | 56 | Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Benjamin A. Sparks, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10204345. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Benjamin A. Sparks, # 2 Exhibit A (Certificate of Good Standing), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 07/13/2023) |
2023-07-17 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 56 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Benjamin A. Sparks. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 07/17/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/17/2023) |
2023-07-17 | 57 | NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin A. Sparks on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Sparks, Benjamin) (Main Document 57 replaced on 7/18/2023) (zjm). (Entered: 07/17/2023) |
2023-08-31 | 58 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 08/31/2023) |
2023-09-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 58 parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further report by November 3, 2023. The parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule with their November status report in the event that disputes remain. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/1/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/01/2023) |
2023-10-10 | 59 | Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Loree Stark, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10408165. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Loree Stark, # 2 Exhibit A (Certificate of Good Standing), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 10/10/2023) |
2023-10-12 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 59 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Loree Stark. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/12/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 10/12/2023) |
2023-10-13 | 60 | NOTICE of Appearance by Loree Stark on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Stark, Loree) (Main Document 60 replaced on 10/16/2023) (znmw). (Entered: 10/13/2023) |
2023-11-03 | 61 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 11/03/2023) |
2023-11-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties' 61 November 3, 2023 joint status report neglected to include the proposed briefing schedule requested in the Court's September 1, 2023 minute order. With the Department of State having completed the productions in 19-cv-2934 and 19-cv-3058 in May 2023, at the latest, and in 19-cv-3387 this month, at the latest, the Court hereby orders consolidated summary judgment briefing on any remaining disputes to proceed as follows: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due January 5, 2024. Plaintiff's combined opposition and cross-motion, if any, shall be due February 5, 2024. Defendant's combined reply and opposition to the cross-motion shall be due March 6, 2024. Plaintiff's reply in support of the cross-motion shall be due March 20, 2024. SO ORDERED by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/6/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 11/06/2023) |
2024-01-05 | 62 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Sparks, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/05/2024) |
2024-01-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 62 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/5/2024. (lccrc3) (Entered: 01/05/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |