Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-10-01 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6409879) filed by RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons as to USAO, # 4 Summons as to AG, # 5 Summons as to DOT)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-01 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-02 | | Case assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zmc) (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-10-02 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-10-09 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 10/09/2019) |
2019-10-21 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Emma Lewis on behalf of RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST (Lewis, Emma) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/22/2019) (ztd). (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/23/2019) (znmw). (Entered: 10/21/2019) |
2019-10-28 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/4/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/3/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/15/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 10/15/2019 (Lewis, Emma) (Entered: 10/28/2019) |
2019-11-04 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 11/04/2019) |
2019-11-04 | 8 | ORDER directing parties to confer and to submit a proposed briefing schedule for the filing of dispositive motions or a proposed processing and production schedule by not later than December 18, 2019. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/4/2019. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 11/04/2019) |
2019-11-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/18/2019. (tb) (Entered: 11/04/2019) |
2019-12-18 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 12/18/2019) |
2019-12-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by not later than February 20, 2020, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/18/2019. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 12/18/2019) |
2019-12-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/20/2020. (tb) (Entered: 12/20/2019) |
2020-02-19 | 10 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST. (Lewis, Emma) (Entered: 02/19/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |