Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-10-01 | 1 | COMPLAINT against NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6410684) filed by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-01 | 2 | NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-07 | | Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zed, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019) |
2019-10-07 | 3 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zed, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019) |
2019-10-24 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of All Defendants (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 10/24/2019) |
2019-11-04 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY served on 10/15/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/04/2019) |
2019-11-04 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 10/15/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/04/2019) |
2019-11-04 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/15/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/04/2019) |
2019-11-04 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/17/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/16/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/04/2019) |
2019-11-18 | 9 | ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 11/18/2019) |
2019-11-19 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing by December 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/19/19. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/19/2019) |
2019-11-19 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Schedule for Disclosure or Briefing due by 12/18/2019. (zkh) (Entered: 11/19/2019) |
2019-12-18 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 12/18/2019) |
2019-12-19 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing by January 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/19/19. (lctjk2) (Entered: 12/19/2019) |
2019-12-19 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule or Disclosure due by 1/21/2020. (zkh) (Entered: 12/19/2019) |
2020-01-21 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 01/21/2020) |
2020-01-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule will govern further proceedings: (1) Defendants shall file their motion for judgment on the pleadings by February 18, 2020; (2) Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendants' motion and his cross-motion by March 17, 2020; (3) Defendants shall file their opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion and their reply in support of their motion by April 7, 2020; and (4) Plaintiff shall file his reply in support of his cross-motion by April 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/27/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/27/2020) |
2020-02-18 | 12 | MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 02/18/2020) |
2020-03-17 | 13 | MOTION for Extension of Time to Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by PATRICK EDDINGTON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 03/17/2020) |
2020-03-17 | | MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, Plaintiff's 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule will govern further proceedings, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed sooner: (1) Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendants' motion and his cross-motion by May 1, 2020; (2) Defendants shall file their opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion and their reply in support of their motion by May 22, 2020; and (3) Plaintiff shall file his reply in support of his cross-motion by June 12, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/17/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 03/17/2020) |
2020-04-16 | 14 | MOTION to Stay Proceedings by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 04/16/2020) |
2020-04-16 | | MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice Defendants' 12 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and denying Defendants' 14 Motion to Stay Proceedings. Upon consideration of Defendants' representations in their Motion, including that the parties reached agreement regarding the scope of [Plaintiff's] modified [FOIA] request," ECF No. 14 at 2, as well as the impact of the COVID-19 pandemic on the operation of Defendant NSA's FOIA office, see ECF No. 14-1, it is hereby ORDERED that (1) Defendants' 12 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is DENIED without prejudice; (2) Defendants' 14 Motion to Stay Proceedings is DENIED; and (3) the parties shall file a joint status report regarding the operation of Defendant NSA's FOIA office and its progress searching and producing records responsive to Plaintiff's modified request by May 15, 2020, and every thirty days thereafter, until the Court orders otherwise. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/16/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 04/16/2020) |
2020-05-15 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 05/15/2020) |
2020-06-15 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 06/15/2020) |
2020-07-15 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 07/15/2020) |
2020-08-14 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 08/14/2020) |
2020-09-14 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 09/14/2020) |
2020-10-14 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 10/14/2020) |
2020-11-13 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 11/13/2020) |
2020-12-14 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 12/14/2020) |
2021-01-13 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 01/13/2021) |
2021-02-12 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 02/12/2021) |
2021-03-15 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 03/15/2021) |
2021-04-14 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 04/14/2021) |
2021-05-14 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 05/14/2021) |
2021-06-14 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 06/14/2021) |
2021-07-14 | 29 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 07/14/2021) |
2021-08-11 | 30 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Thomas Anthony Quinn on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Katherine Palmer-Ball (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 08/11/2021) |
2021-08-13 | 31 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 08/13/2021) |
2021-09-13 | 32 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 09/13/2021) |
2021-10-13 | 33 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 10/13/2021) |
2021-11-12 | 34 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 11/12/2021) |
2021-12-13 | 35 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 12/13/2021) |
2022-01-12 | 36 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 01/12/2022) |
2022-01-21 | 37 | NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2022) |
2022-01-21 | 38 | MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2022) |
2022-02-07 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 38 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Upon consideration of the 38 Motion to Withdraw, the Court concludes that counsel's withdrawal would not "unduly delay trial of the case, or be unfairly prejudicial to any party, or otherwise not be in the interest of justice." LCvR 83.6(d). Thus, it is hereby ORDERED that the 38 Motion is GRANTED, and Joshua Hart Burday is permitted to withdraw from his representation of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 02/07/2022. (lctjk2) (Entered: 02/07/2022) |
2022-02-14 | 39 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 02/14/2022) |
2022-03-11 | 40 | NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 03/11/2022) |
2022-03-14 | 41 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 03/14/2022) |
2022-04-14 | 42 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 04/14/2022) |
2022-05-16 | 43 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 05/16/2022) |
2022-06-16 | 44 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 06/16/2022) |
2022-07-15 | 45 | STATUS REPORT by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 07/15/2022) |
2022-08-15 | 46 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 08/15/2022) |
2022-09-15 | 47 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 09/15/2022) |
2022-10-14 | 48 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 10/14/2022) |
2022-11-14 | 49 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 11/14/2022) |
2022-12-14 | 50 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 12/14/2022) |
2023-01-17 | 51 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 01/17/2023) |
2023-02-14 | 52 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 02/14/2023) |
2023-03-01 | 53 | NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-14 | 54 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-04-13 | 55 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 04/13/2023) |
2023-05-15 | 56 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 05/15/2023) |
2023-06-14 | 57 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 06/14/2023) |
2023-07-14 | 58 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 07/14/2023) |
2023-07-14 | 59 | Joint MOTION to Modify Court's April 16, 2020 Minute Order by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 07/14/2023) |
2023-07-16 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 58 59 Joint Motion to Modify Court Order. Upon consideration of the parties' 58 59 Joint Status Report and Motion to Modify Court Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the 58 59 Joint Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that parties shall file a joint status report regarding the operation of Defendant NSA's FOIA office and its progress searching and producing records responsive to Plaintiff's modified request by September 14, 2023, and every sixty days thereafter, until the Court orders otherwise. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/16/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/16/2023) |
2023-07-17 | 60 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Fithawi Berhane on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney John Truong and Thomas Quinn (Berhane, Fithawi) (Entered: 07/17/2023) |
2023-09-14 | 61 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Berhane, Fithawi) (Entered: 09/14/2023) |
2023-11-13 | 62 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Berhane, Fithawi) (Entered: 11/13/2023) |
2024-01-12 | 63 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Berhane, Fithawi) (Entered: 01/12/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |