Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-10-01 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6411487) filed by NOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC, f/k/a THE EYE MACHINE, LLC, AMC HOLDINGS CO., LLC, LANTSON E. ELDRED, PETER POCKLINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5)(Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-01 | 2 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AMC HOLDINGS CO., LLC, LANTSON E. ELDRED, NOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC, f/k/a THE EYE MACHINE, LLC, PETER POCKLINGTON. Case related to Case No. 19-666. (Himes, Lisa) Modified on 10/3/2019 (zrdj). (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-01 | 3 | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AMC HOLDINGS CO., LLC, LANTSON E. ELDRED, NOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC, f/k/a THE EYE MACHINE, LLC, PETER POCKLINGTON. Case related to Case No. 19-2700. and 19-666 (Himes, Lisa) Modified on 10/3/2019 (zrdj). (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-03 | | NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 2 Notice of Related Case was entered as a duplicate to docket entry 3 Notice of Related Case. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/03/2019) |
2019-10-03 | | Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/03/2019) |
2019-10-03 | 4 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMC Holdings Co., LLC and by NOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 10/03/2019) |
2019-10-03 | 5 | SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/03/2019) |
2019-10-14 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/8/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/7/2019. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 10/14/2019) |
2019-10-14 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/8/2019. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 10/14/2019) |
2019-10-14 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION served on 10/9/2019 (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 10/14/2019) |
2019-10-15 | 9 | NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/15/2019) |
2019-11-06 | 10 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/06/2019) |
2019-11-06 | | MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before November 20, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 6, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 11/06/2019) |
2019-11-20 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/20/2019) |
2019-11-20 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before December 20, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 20, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 11/20/2019) |
2019-12-20 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/20/2019) |
2019-12-20 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before January 20, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 20, 2019. (Entered: 12/20/2019) |
2020-01-21 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/21/2020) |
2020-01-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before March 2, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 22, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 01/22/2020) |
2020-01-22 | 14 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brenda A. Gonzalez on behalf of U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION Substituting for attorney Damon Taaffe (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 01/22/2020) |
2020-03-02 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 03/02/2020) |
2020-03-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before April 2, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 2, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 03/02/2020) |
2020-04-02 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 04/02/2020) |
2020-04-03 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before May 18, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 3, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 04/03/2020) |
2020-05-18 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 05/18/2020) |
2020-05-18 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before June 19, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 18, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 05/18/2020) |
2020-05-26 | 18 | NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Tilghman on behalf of U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2020) |
2020-06-19 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 06/19/2020) |
2020-06-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before July 31, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 22, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 06/22/2020) |
2020-07-31 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 07/31/2020) |
2020-08-03 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before September 14, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 3, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 08/03/2020) |
2020-08-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/14/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 08/03/2020) |
2020-09-14 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2020) |
2020-09-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 21 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before October 14, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 14, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/14/2020) |
2020-09-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/14/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 09/15/2020) |
2020-09-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/14/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 09/15/2020) |
2020-09-15 | 22 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 09/15/2020) |
2020-10-14 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2020) |
2020-10-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 23 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before November 13, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 14, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 10/14/2020) |
2020-10-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/13/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 10/15/2020) |
2020-11-13 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2020) |
2020-11-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 24 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before December 18, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 16, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 11/16/2020) |
2020-11-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/18/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 11/16/2020) |
2020-12-18 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 12/18/2020) |
2020-12-21 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 25 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before January 19, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 21, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 12/21/2020) |
2021-01-19 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2021) |
2021-01-19 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 26 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before March 2, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 19, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 01/19/2021) |
2021-03-02 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 03/02/2021) |
2021-03-03 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 27 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before April 16, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 3, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/03/2021) |
2021-04-16 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 04/16/2021) |
2021-04-19 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 28 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before June 2, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 19, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 04/19/2021) |
2021-06-02 | 29 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 06/02/2021) |
2021-06-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 29 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before July 19, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 2, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 06/02/2021) |
2021-07-19 | 30 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 07/19/2021) |
2021-07-19 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 30 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before September 2, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 19, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 07/19/2021) |
2021-09-02 | 31 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 09/02/2021) |
2021-09-03 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 31 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before October 19, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 3, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/03/2021) |
2021-10-19 | 32 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2021) |
2021-10-20 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 32 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before December 3, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 20, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 10/20/2021) |
2021-12-03 | 33 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2021) |
2021-12-06 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 33 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before January 18, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 6, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 12/06/2021) |
2022-01-18 | 34 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 01/18/2022) |
2022-01-18 | 35 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. Attorney Brenda A. Gonzalez-Horowitz terminated. (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 01/18/2022) |
2022-01-26 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 34 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before February 23, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 26, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 01/26/2022) |
2022-02-23 | 36 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 02/23/2022) |
2022-03-01 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 36 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before April 11, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 1, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/01/2022) |
2022-04-11 | 37 | NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 04/11/2022) |
2022-04-11 | 38 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 04/11/2022) |
2022-04-12 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 38 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before June 10, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 12, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 04/12/2022) |
2022-06-10 | 39 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. Food and Drug Administration and by AMC HOLDINGS CO., LLC, LANTSON E. ELDRED, NOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC, PETER POCKLINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 06/10/2022) |
2022-06-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 39 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before August 3, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 16, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 06/16/2022) |
2022-06-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/3/2022 (zjch, ) (Entered: 06/17/2022) |
2022-07-08 | 40 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. Attorney Stephen DeGenaro terminated. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 07/08/2022) |
2022-08-03 | 41 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 08/03/2022) |
2022-08-04 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 41 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before September 30, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 4, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 08/04/2022) |
2022-09-30 | 42 | NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 09/30/2022) |
2022-09-30 | 43 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by U.S. Food and Drug Administration and by AMC HOLDINGS CO., LLC, LANTSON E. ELDRED, NOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC, PETER POCKLINGTON. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 09/30/2022) |
2022-09-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 43 Stipulation of Dismissal, the plaintiffs' claims against the defendant are DISMISSED without prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 30, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/30/2022) |
Hide Docket Events |