Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-10-02 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6412546) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Department of State)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-10-02 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-10-02 | 3 | CIVIL COVER SHEET by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. re 1 Complaint, filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC..(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-10-07 | | Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zed, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019) |
2019-10-07 | 4 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zed, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019) |
2019-10-08 | 5 | STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 8, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 10/08/2019) |
2019-10-21 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/16/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/15/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/18/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 10/16/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 10/21/2019) |
2019-11-15 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Luh, James) (Entered: 11/15/2019) |
2019-11-15 | | Minute Order (paperless) DIRECTING the plaintiff to show cause, by November 22, 2019, why this case should not be consolidated with 19-cv-2961 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42; and further DIRECTING defendant to file, by November 26, 2019, any reply to the plaintiffs response. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 15, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 11/15/2019) |
2019-11-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to Show Cause due by 11/22/2019; defendant's reply, if any, due by 11/26/2019. (tg) (Entered: 11/18/2019) |
2019-11-22 | 8 | NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Orfanedes on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/22/2019) |
2019-11-22 | 9 | RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. re Order, filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/22/2019) |
2019-11-25 | 10 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Luh, James) (Entered: 11/25/2019) |
2019-11-25 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Join Status Report and DIRECTING the parties to file, by December 3, 2019, a Joint Status Report in accordance with paragraph 3 of the 5 Standing Order. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 25, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 11/25/2019) |
2019-11-25 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/3/2019. (tg) (Entered: 11/25/2019) |
2019-11-25 | 11 | REPLY re Order, Order, (Defendants' Reply in Response to November 15, 2019, Orders of the Court) filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Luh, James) (Entered: 11/25/2019) |
2019-11-25 | | Minute Order (paperless) CONSOLIDATING, upon consideration of 9 Plaintiff's Response to the Court's November 15, 2019 Order to Show Cause and 11 Defendants' Reply in Response to November 15, 2019 Orders of the Court, this case, Civil Case No. 19-2960, with Judicial Watch, Inc. v. U.S. Dep't of the Treasury , Civil Case No. 19-2961, for all purposes. See Local Rule 40.5; Fed. R. Civ. P. 42. The parties are directed that all filings in these consolidated cases shall be made only in Case No. 19-2960. The Clerk shall close Case No. 19-2961 and transfer whatever parties are not identical to Case No. 19-2960. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 25, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 11/25/2019) |
2019-11-25 | | CASE CONSOLIDATED. Case 19-2961 has been consolidated with 19-2961 pursuant to a MINUTE ORDER entered 11/25/2019. From this date forward all pleadings shall be filed ONLY in Civil Action No. 19-2960. The parties are advised NOT to elect to SPREAD text when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails (zrdj) (Entered: 11/26/2019) |
2019-12-03 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Luh, James) (Entered: 12/03/2019) |
2019-12-04 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the parties are DIRECTED to file, by January 10, 2020, a further joint status report including a proposed schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 4, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 12/04/2019) |
2019-12-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/10/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 12/04/2019) |
2020-01-10 | 13 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 01/10/2020) |
2020-01-11 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the 13 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice dismissing this case with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the Clerk of Court to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 11, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 01/11/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |