Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-10-02 | 1 | COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6412667) filed by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-10-02 | 2 | NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-10-04 | | Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/04/2019) |
2019-10-04 | 3 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/04/2019) |
2019-10-04 | 4 | STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/04/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019) |
2019-11-05 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 10/10/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/05/2019) |
2019-11-05 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/10/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/05/2019) |
2019-11-05 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/10/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/05/2019) |
2019-11-05 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/10/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/9/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/05/2019) |
2019-11-12 | 9 | ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/12/2019) |
2019-11-14 | 10 | ERRATA for Corrected Answer to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE 9 Answer to Complaint filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Corrected Answer)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/14/2019) |
2019-11-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on December 17, 2019 at 10:15 a.m. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file, on or before December 10, 2019, a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents, and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/26/19. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 11/26/2019) |
2019-11-26 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/10/2019. (kt) (Entered: 11/26/2019) |
2019-12-09 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/09/2019) |
2019-12-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' status report, Dkt. 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court of whether any substantive areas of disagreement exist and identifying the parties' respective positions on or before February 12, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/9/19. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 12/09/2019) |
2019-12-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/12/2020 informing the Court of whether any substantive areas of disagreement exist and identifying the parties' respective positions. (dot) (Entered: 12/10/2019) |
2019-12-13 | 12 | MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone Motion to Conduct Initial Scheduling Conference Telephonically by PATRICK EDDINGTON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/13/2019) |
2019-12-16 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's motion to conduct initial scheduling conference telephonically, Dkt. 12 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel may appear via telephone at the December 17, 2019 scheduling conference. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/16/19. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 12/16/2019) |
2019-12-17 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 12/17/2019. Issues addressed. (Court Reporter: Scott Wallace.) (kt) (Entered: 12/17/2019) |
2020-01-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the terms of the Court's revised standing order, which is available on the Court's website. Click for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/23/20. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 01/23/2020) |
2020-02-12 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/12/2020) |
2020-02-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 13 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before March 12, 2020, informing the Court of any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. The Court refers the parties to its revised standing order, Minute Order (Jan. 23, 2020), which explains the Court's requirement that the parties file previews of their anticipated arguments and participate in a pre-motion conference prior to filing motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/12/20. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 02/12/2020) |
2020-03-12 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/12/2020) |
2020-03-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 14 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before April 16, 2020 to alert the Court to whether the parties have been able to resolve any substantive areas of disagreement. If the parties anticipate filing dispositive motions at that juncture, the joint status report shall propose dates for the parties to file brief previews of their anticipated motions and any oppositions. The Court directs the parties to its updated standing order, which outlines the Court's new procedure concerning pre-motion conferences and filings in anticipation of those conferences. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/13/20. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 03/13/2020) |
2020-03-31 | 15 | Consent MOTION to Stay by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/31/2020) |
2020-03-31 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's consent motion to stay deadlines, Dkt. 15 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the deadlines for processing and producing documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA requests are hereby STAYED until April 28, 2020. It is further ORDERED that, on or before April 28, 2020, Defendant shall file a status report updating Plaintiff and the Court regarding when Defendants believe they will be able to resume processing and production. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/31/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 03/31/2020) |
2020-04-01 | | Case STAYED. (kt) (Entered: 04/01/2020) |
2020-04-01 | 16 | ERRATA by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE 15 Consent MOTION to Stay filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/01/2020) |
2020-04-02 | 17 | NOTICE by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/02/2020) |
2020-04-27 | 18 | STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/27/2020) |
2020-04-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' status report, Dkt. 18 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a further status report on or before May 28, 2020 informing the Court of the status of their work in this case, specifically in providing a search explanation to Plaintiff and proposing next steps. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/28/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 04/28/2020) |
2020-05-28 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/28/2020) |
2020-05-29 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' joint status report, Dkt. 19 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before July 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/29/2020. (lcrdm1) Modified on 6/10/2020 to correct typo (kt). (Entered: 05/29/2020) |
2020-07-10 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 07/10/2020) |
2020-07-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's status report, Dkt. 20 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a further status report on or before August 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/13/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 07/13/2020) |
2020-08-17 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 08/17/2020) |
2020-08-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the status report, Dkt. 21 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a further status report on or before September 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/18/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 08/18/2020) |
2020-09-17 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 09/17/2020) |
2020-09-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Parties' joint status report, Dkt. 22 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a further joint status report on or before October 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/17/20. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 09/17/2020) |
2020-10-22 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/22/2020) |
2020-10-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Parties' joint status report, Dkt. 23 , it is hereby ORDERED that Parties shall file a further joint status report on or before December 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/22/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 10/22/2020) |
2020-12-01 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/01/2020) |
2021-01-19 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 01/19/2021) |
2021-01-19 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 25 , it is herby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 25, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 01/19/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 01/19/2021) |
2021-02-25 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/25/2021) |
2021-02-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 26 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a further status report on or before March 31, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 02/25/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 02/25/2021) |
2021-03-31 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/31/2021) |
2021-04-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 27 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before May 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 04/01/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 04/01/2021) |
2021-05-27 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/27/2021) |
2021-05-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 28 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a further status report on or before July 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 05/28/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 05/28/2021) |
2021-07-26 | 29 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 07/26/2021) |
2021-07-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 29 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before September 28, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 07/26/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 07/26/2021) |
2021-09-28 | 30 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 09/28/2021) |
2021-09-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 30 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before October 28, 2021, proposing a briefing schedule for resolving the parties' present dispute. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/28/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 09/28/2021) |
2021-10-14 | 31 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/14/2021) |
2021-10-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 31 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before December 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/15/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 10/15/2021) |
2021-12-03 | 32 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/03/2021) |
2021-12-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 32 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/6/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 12/06/2021) |
2022-01-21 | 33 | NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2022) |
2022-01-21 | 34 | MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Joshua Burday by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2022) |
2022-01-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the motion to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff's counsel, Dkt. 34 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Joshua Burday is hereby granted leave to withdraw his appearance as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/22/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 01/22/2022) |
2022-02-15 | 35 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/15/2022) |
2022-02-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 35 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before April 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/17/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 02/17/2022) |
2022-04-14 | 36 | STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/14/2022) |
2022-04-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' status report, Dkt. 36 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a further status report on or before June 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/15/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 04/15/2022) |
2022-04-18 | 37 | NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 04/18/2022) |
2022-06-21 | 38 | STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 06/21/2022) |
2022-06-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' status report, Dkt. 38 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a further status report on or before August 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/24/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 06/24/2022) |
2022-08-26 | 39 | STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 08/26/2022) |
2022-08-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's status report, Dkt. 39 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a further status report on or before November 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/28/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 08/28/2022) |
2022-11-14 | 40 | STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/14/2022) |
2023-01-19 | 41 | STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 01/19/2023) |
2023-01-20 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 41 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before March 24, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/20/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 01/20/2023) |
2023-01-20 | | Joint Status Report due by 3/24/2023 (zglw) (Entered: 01/20/2023) |
2023-03-01 | 42 | NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-23 | 43 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/23/2023) |
2023-03-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 43 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before May 24, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/25/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 03/25/2023) |
2023-05-20 | 44 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/20/2023) |
2023-05-22 | 45 | ERRATA CORRECTION OF JSR by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 44 Status Report. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/22/2023) |
2023-05-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 45 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before July 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/23/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 05/23/2023) |
2023-07-20 | 46 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 07/20/2023) |
2023-07-20 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 46 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before September 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/20/2023. (lcdrm1) (Entered: 07/20/2023) |
2023-09-19 | 47 | NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Stich Match on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Match, Stephen) (Entered: 09/19/2023) |
2023-09-21 | 48 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 09/21/2023) |
2023-09-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 48 , the parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a pre-motion conference on October 2, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 8. The parties should be prepared to discuss the remaining issues in this case, including attorneys' fees and costs, and a path forward to resolving those issues. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/25/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 09/25/2023) |
2023-09-26 | 49 | Unopposed MOTION for Remote Conference by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Match, Stephen) (Entered: 09/26/2023) |
2023-09-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's unopposed motion for remote conference, Dkt. 49 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The parties are ORDERED to appear for a pre-motion conference on October 2, 2023 at 10:30 a.m., as previously scheduled, via zoom. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/26/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 09/26/2023) |
2023-10-02 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Pre-motion Conference held on 10/2/2023. Joint Status Report due on or before 11/9/2023. (Court Reporter Lisa Moreira) (zglw) (Entered: 10/02/2023) |
2023-11-08 | 50 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/08/2023) |
2023-11-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 50 , and in light of section 10(a) of the Court's Standing Order, the Court finds a pre-motion conference is appropriate. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear on December 1, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. via zoom. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff submit a short notice setting forth the basis for his anticipated motion on or before November 20, 2023, and Defendants submit a short notice setting forth their anticipated response to the motion on or before November 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/9/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 11/09/2023) |
2023-11-20 | 51 | MEMORANDUM by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Match, Stephen) (Entered: 11/20/2023) |
2023-11-27 | 52 | RESPONSE re 51 Memorandum filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/27/2023) |
2023-11-29 | 53 | ERRATA re 51 MEMORANDUM by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Match, Stephen) Modified on 11/30/2023 to add docket link (zjm). (Entered: 11/29/2023) |
2023-11-29 | 54 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/29/2023) |
2023-11-30 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Defendants' consent motion to reschedule the premotion conference, Dkt. 54 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The premotion conference scheduled for December 1, 2023 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to December 15, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/30/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 11/30/2023) |
2023-11-30 | 55 | Unopposed MOTION Remote Conference by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Match, Stephen) (Entered: 11/30/2023) |
2023-12-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's unopposed motion for remote conference, Dkt. 55 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The parties are ORDERED to appear for a pre-motion conference on December 15, 2023 at 11:00 a.m., as previously scheduled, via zoom. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/4/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 12/04/2023) |
2023-12-15 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Pre-motion Conference held on 12/15/2023. Plaintiff to file a Motions for attorney fees on or before by 1/12/2024. Defendant's Response due on or before 2/12/2024 and Reply due on or before 3/11/2024. (Court Reporter Tammi Sefranek) (zglw) (Entered: 12/15/2023) |
2024-01-08 | 56 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Fee Petition by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Match, Stephen) (Entered: 01/08/2024) |
2024-01-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's consent motion to extend time, Dkt. 56 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff file his fee petition on or before February 12, 2024; Defendants file their response on or before March 12, 2024; and Plaintiff file his reply on or before April 11, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/9/2024. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 01/09/2024) |
2024-02-12 | 57 | MOTION for Attorney Fees by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Topic Decl, # 2 Declaration Eddington Decl)(Match, Stephen) (Entered: 02/12/2024) |
2024-03-05 | 58 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/05/2024) |
2024-03-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's consent motion to extend time, Dkt. 58 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees on or before March 22, 2024, and Plaintiff shall file his reply on or before April 22, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/6/2024. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 03/06/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |