Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-07-31 | 1 | COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2736070.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Jenson, Maresa) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2019) |
2019-07-31 | 2 | Civil Cover Sheet. (Jenson, Maresa) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2019) |
2019-07-31 | 3 | Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alaska Wilderness League. (Jenson, Maresa) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2019) |
2019-07-31 | 4 | Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defenders of Wildlife. (Jenson, Maresa) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2019) |
2019-07-31 | 5 | Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gwich'in Steering Committee. (Jenson, Maresa) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2019) |
2019-07-31 | 6 | Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Wilderness Society. (Jenson, Maresa) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2019) |
2019-07-31 | 7 | MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney David A. Bahr. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2736174.) by Alaska Wilderness League, Defenders of Wildlife, Gwich'in Steering Committee, The Wilderness Society. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Jenson, Maresa) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2019) |
2019-07-31 | 8 | Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Department of the Interior, (Attachments: # 1 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Bureau of Land Management, # 2 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service)(PXS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2019) |
2019-07-31 | | Summons Issued as to U.S. Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service.(PXS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2019) |
2019-07-31 | 9 | Amended Civil Cover Sheet. (Jenson, Maresa) Modified on 8/1/2019 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2019) |
2019-08-01 | 10 | CLERK'S NOTICE re 7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David A. Bahr, at docket 7 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 08/01/2019) |
2019-08-14 | 11 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alaska Wilderness League, Gwich'in Steering Committee, Defenders of Wildlife, The Wilderness Society. U.S. Bureau of Land Management served on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Jenson, Maresa) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 08/14/2019) |
2019-08-14 | 12 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alaska Wilderness League, Gwich'in Steering Committee, Defenders of Wildlife, The Wilderness Society. U.S. Department of the Interior served on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Jenson, Maresa) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 08/14/2019) |
2019-08-14 | 13 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alaska Wilderness League, Gwich'in Steering Committee, Defenders of Wildlife, The Wilderness Society. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service served on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Jenson, Maresa) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 08/14/2019) |
2019-09-16 | 14 | MOTION to Transfer and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by U.S. Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - District of Columbia Live Database, # 3 Exhibit C - LexisNexis CourtLink Search, # 4 Proposed Order)(Fonstad, John) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 09/16/2019) |
2019-09-21 | 15 | MOTION to Expedite (Unopposed) Consideration of Motion to Transfer and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Alaska Wilderness League, Defenders of Wildlife, Gwich'in Steering Committee, The Wilderness Society. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Valerie) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 09/21/2019) |
2019-09-21 | 16 | DECLARATION of Maresa Jenson re 15 MOTION to Expedite (Unopposed) Consideration of Motion to Transfer and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Alaska Wilderness League, Defenders of Wildlife, Gwich'in Steering Committee, The Wilderness Society. (Brown, Valerie) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 09/21/2019) |
2019-09-21 | 17 | RESPONSE in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Transfer and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Alaska Wilderness League, Defenders of Wildlife, Gwich'in Steering Committee, The Wilderness Society. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Valerie) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 09/21/2019) |
2019-09-21 | 18 | DECLARATION of Maresa Jenson re 17 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Alaska Wilderness League, Defenders of Wildlife, Gwich'in Steering Committee, The Wilderness Society. (Brown, Valerie) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 09/21/2019) |
2019-09-24 | 19 | RESPONSE in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Expedite (Unopposed) Consideration of Motion to Transfer and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Partial) filed by U.S. Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Fonstad, John) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 09/24/2019) |
2019-09-24 | 20 | ORDER granting 15 Motion to Expedite Consideration re 14 Motion to Transfer and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Response. Reply due 9/27/19. Defendants to notify the court by 9/25/19 if no intention to file a reply. (JLH, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 09/24/2019) |
2019-09-27 | 21 | REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 MOTION to Transfer and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by U.S. Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Dkt 14, # 2 Exhibit B- Dkt 15)(Fonstad, John) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 09/27/2019) |
2019-09-30 | 22 | ORDER granting 14 Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 9/30/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 09/30/2019) |
2019-10-03 | 23 | Case transferred in from District of Alaska; Case Number 3:19-cv-00208. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/03/2019) |
2019-10-08 | 24 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Maresa Jenson, :Firm- Trustees for Alaska, :Address- 1026 W. 4th Ave., Suite 201, Anchorage, AK 99501. Phone No. - (907) 308-8678. Fax No. - N/A Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6430004. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Maresa Jenson in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to allow Maresa Jensonto Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 10/08/2019) |
2019-10-08 | 25 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Valerie Brown, :Firm- Trustees for Alaska, :Address- 1026 W. 4th Ave., Suite 201, Anchorage, AK 99501. Phone No. - (907) 308-5797. Fax No. - N/A Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6430065. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Valerie Brown in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to allow Valerie Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 10/08/2019) |
2019-11-08 | 26 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/16/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/15/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Maresa Jenson, # 2 Exhibit A)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 11/08/2019) |
2019-11-13 | 27 | NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of All Defendants (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/13/2019) |
2019-11-13 | 28 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Answer to the Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/13/2019) |
2019-11-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendants' 28 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' Motion is GRANTED and that Defendants' Exhibit 28-1, designated as the Answer to Complaint, shall be accepted as filed. Now before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. According to Local Civil Rule 16.3, the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) are inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before December 13, 2019. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiffs' FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs' FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiffs; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 27, 2019. (lccjn3) (Entered: 11/28/2019) |
2019-11-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' 24 Motion for Leave for Maresa Jenson to Appear Pro Hac Vice , and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Maresa Jenson, 1026 W. 4th Ave., Suite 201, Anchorage, AK 99501 is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 27, 2019. (lccjn3) (Entered: 11/28/2019) |
2019-11-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' 25 Motion for Leave for Valerie Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice , and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Valerie Brown, 1026 W. 4th Ave., Suite 201, Anchorage, AK 99501 is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 27, 2019. (lccj3) (Entered: 11/28/2019) |
2019-12-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 12/13/2019. (mac) (Entered: 12/02/2019) |
2019-12-13 | 29 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 12/13/2019) |
2020-01-13 | 30 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Jenson, Maresa) (Entered: 01/13/2020) |
2020-01-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 29 and 30 Joint Status Reports, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before January 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 15, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 01/15/2020) |
2020-01-17 | 31 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jenson, Maresa) (Entered: 01/17/2020) |
2020-01-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 31 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before February 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 28, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 01/28/2020) |
2020-01-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/18/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 01/30/2020) |
2020-02-18 | 32 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jenson, Maresa) (Entered: 02/18/2020) |
2020-03-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 32 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before March 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 2, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 03/02/2020) |
2020-03-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/18/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/12/2020) |
2020-03-18 | 33 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jenson, Maresa) (Entered: 03/18/2020) |
2020-03-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 33 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before April 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 30, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 03/30/2020) |
2020-04-20 | 34 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jenson, Maresa) (Entered: 04/20/2020) |
2020-05-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 34 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before May 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 5, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 05/05/2020) |
2020-05-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/20/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 05/05/2020) |
2020-05-20 | 35 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jenson, Maresa) (Entered: 05/20/2020) |
2020-05-27 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 35 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before June 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 27, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 05/27/2020) |
2020-06-04 | 36 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brook-Marie Brisson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7196325. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Brook-Marie Brisson in Support of Motion to Appear PHV, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to allow Brook-Marie Brisson to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 06/04/2020) |
2020-06-09 | 37 | NOTICE of Appearance by Maresa Jenson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jenson, Maresa) (Main Document 37 replaced on 6/9/2020) (zeg). (Entered: 06/09/2020) |
2020-06-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's 36 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brook-Marie Brisson, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Brook-Marie Brisson is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice . Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 15, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 06/15/2020) |
2020-06-18 | 38 | NOTICE of Appearance by Brook Brisson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 06/18/2020) |
2020-06-19 | 39 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jenson, Maresa) (Entered: 06/19/2020) |
2020-06-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 39 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before July 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 22, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 06/22/2020) |
2020-06-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/24/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 06/23/2020) |
2020-07-21 | 40 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Daniel P. Schaefer (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 07/21/2020) |
2020-07-24 | 41 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Jenson, Maresa) (Entered: 07/24/2020) |
2020-07-27 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 41 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before August 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 27, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 07/27/2020) |
2020-07-27 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/26/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 07/28/2020) |
2020-08-26 | 42 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Jenson, Maresa) (Entered: 08/26/2020) |
2020-09-23 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 42 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report by September 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 23, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 09/23/2020) |
2020-09-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/30/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 09/23/2020) |
2020-09-30 | 43 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 09/30/2020) |
2020-10-01 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 43 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit another Joint Status Report by October 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 1, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 10/01/2020) |
2020-10-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/30/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 10/01/2020) |
2020-10-30 | 44 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 10/30/2020) |
2020-11-18 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 44 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by December 4, 2020 . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 18, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 11/18/2020) |
2020-11-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 11/18/2020) |
2020-12-04 | 45 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 12/04/2020) |
2020-12-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 45 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file another Joint Status Report by January 15, 2021 . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 8, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 12/08/2020) |
2020-12-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/15/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 12/08/2020) |
2021-01-15 | 46 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 01/15/2021) |
2021-01-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 46 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file another Joint Status Report by February 19, 2021 . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 22, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 01/22/2021) |
2021-01-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/19/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 01/25/2021) |
2021-02-18 | 47 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 02/18/2021) |
2021-02-19 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 47 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that they file another Joint Status Report by March 26, 2021 . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 19, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 02/19/2021) |
2021-02-19 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/26/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 02/22/2021) |
2021-03-26 | 48 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 03/26/2021) |
2021-04-12 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 48 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties submit another Joint Status Report by April 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 12, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 04/12/2021) |
2021-04-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/21/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 04/12/2021) |
2021-04-21 | 49 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 04/21/2021) |
2021-05-28 | 50 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 05/28/2021) |
2021-06-23 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 50 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that they file an additional Joint Status Report by June 30, 2021 . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 23, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 06/23/2021) |
2021-06-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/30/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 06/24/2021) |
2021-06-30 | 51 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 06/30/2021) |
2021-07-01 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 51 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that they file an additional Joint Status Report by July 30, 2021 . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 1, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 07/01/2021) |
2021-07-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/30/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 07/02/2021) |
2021-07-30 | 52 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 07/30/2021) |
2021-08-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 52 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that they file an additional Joint Status Report by August 31, 2021 , and every 30 days thereafter until this matter is resolved. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 5, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 08/05/2021) |
2021-08-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/31/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 08/06/2021) |
2021-08-30 | 53 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 08/30/2021) |
2021-09-29 | 54 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/29/2021) |
2021-10-29 | 55 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 10/29/2021) |
2021-11-02 | 56 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE Substituting for attorney Kathleene A. Molen (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/02/2021) |
2021-11-29 | 57 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 11/29/2021) |
2021-12-23 | 58 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 12/23/2021) |
2022-01-28 | 59 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 01/28/2022) |
2022-02-28 | 60 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 02/28/2022) |
2022-03-30 | 61 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 03/30/2022) |
2022-04-28 | 62 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/28/2022) |
2022-05-31 | 63 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 05/31/2022) |
2022-06-29 | 64 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/29/2022) |
2022-08-01 | 65 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 08/01/2022) |
2022-08-30 | 66 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 08/30/2022) |
2022-09-30 | 67 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Brisson, Brook) (Entered: 09/30/2022) |
2022-10-31 | 68 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/31/2022) |
2022-11-30 | 69 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/30/2022) |
2022-12-06 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Parties' request in the Joint Status Report 69 , it is hereby ORDERED that the request is GRANTED. The next Joint Status Report shall be filed on or before January 13, 2023. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 6, 2022. (lccjn3) (Entered: 12/06/2022) |
2022-12-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/13/2023. (zkh) (Entered: 12/06/2022) |
2023-01-11 | 70 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/11/2023) |
2023-01-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Parties' Joint Status Report 70 , it is hereby ORDERED that the next status report shall be filed on or before March 14, 2023. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 17, 2023. (lccjn3) (Entered: 01/17/2023) |
2023-01-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/14/2023. (zcam) (Entered: 01/18/2023) |
2023-03-09 | 71 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/09/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |