Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-10-01 | 1 | COMPLAINT against WILLIAM BARR, KELLY KNIGHT CRAFT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, LEEANN VEATCH filed by AMY MISCHLER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd) (Entered: 10/04/2019) |
2019-10-01 | 2 | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AMY MISCHLER. Case related to Case No. 19-2493. (ztd) (Entered: 10/04/2019) |
2019-10-07 | | Summons (3) Issued as to WILLIAM BARR, KELLY KNIGHT CRAFT, LEEANN VEATCH. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/07/2019) |
2019-10-10 | 3 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WILLIAM BARR served on 10/07/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/08/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/30/19. (ztd) Modified dates served on 10/23/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 10/15/2019) |
2019-10-30 | 4 | ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of her obligation to follow the FRCP, Local Rules and orders of the court. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order: AMY MISCHLER, 1120 Palm Court, Okeechobee, FL 34974. (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/30/19. (DJS) (Entered: 10/30/2019) |
2020-04-16 | 5 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall show cause in writing by 5/15/20 why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: AMY MISCHLER 1120 Palm Court, Okeechobee, FL 34974. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/16/2020. (Attachments: # 1 US Attorney's letter regarding service of process) (DJS) (Entered: 04/16/2020) |
2020-04-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 5/15/2020. (tb) (Entered: 04/16/2020) |
2020-05-12 | 6 | RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by AMY MISCHLER re 5 Order to Show Cause, filed by AMY MISCHLER. (ztd) (Entered: 05/14/2020) |
2020-05-12 | 7 | MOTION for CM/ECF Password by AMY MISCHLER (ztd) (Entered: 05/14/2020) |
2020-07-21 | 8 | ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: AMY MISCHLER, 1120 Palm Court, Okeechobee, FL 34974. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/21/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 07/21/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |