Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-10-04 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6418739) filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons to U.S. Department of Justice, # 4 Summons to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, # 5 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, # 6 Summons to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/04/2019) |
2019-10-04 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/04/2019) |
2019-10-09 | | Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zed, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019) |
2019-10-09 | 3 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zed, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019) |
2019-10-11 | 4 | Case randomly reassigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Judge Dabney L. Friedrich is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 10/15/2019) |
2019-10-21 | 5 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rachel E. Goodman, :Firm- Protect Democracy Project, Inc., :Address- 115 Broadway, 5th Floor, New York, NY 10006. Phone No. - 2025794582. Fax No. - 9297778428 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BDCDC-6466069. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration by Rachel E. Goodman, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/21/2019) |
2019-10-21 | 6 | GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/21/2019. (jag) (Entered: 10/21/2019) |
2019-10-22 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Rachel E. Goodman is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiff. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/22/2019. (JAG) (Entered: 10/22/2019) |
2019-10-28 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/28/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/27/2019. (Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/28/2019) |
2019-10-28 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/28/2019. (Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/28/2019) |
2019-10-28 | 9 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 10/28/2019 (Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/28/2019) |
2019-10-28 | 10 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/28/2019 (Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/28/2019) |
2019-10-29 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Goodman on behalf of PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Goodman, Rachel) (Entered: 10/29/2019) |
2019-11-27 | 12 | NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Mussenden on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 11/27/2019) |
2019-11-27 | 13 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 11/27/2019) |
2019-12-02 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 12/4/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/2/2019. (jag) (Entered: 12/02/2019) |
2019-12-02 | 14 | NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Schuster on behalf of PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Schuster, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/02/2019) |
2019-12-04 | 15 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 12/04/2019) |
2019-12-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall review this Court's 6 General Order and Guidelines Applicable to FOIA Cases, and promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing motions for summary judgment, on or before 12/19/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/5/2019. (jag) (Entered: 12/05/2019) |
2019-12-19 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT and Agreed Proposed Interim Disclosure Schedule by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Schuster, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/19/2019) |
2020-01-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 3/24/2020, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/2/2020. (jag) (Entered: 01/02/2020) |
2020-02-27 | 17 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew C. Ziegler, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6869017. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Matthew C. Ziegler, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schuster, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/27/2020) |
2020-02-27 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Matthew C. Ziegler is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiff. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/27/2020. (jag) (Entered: 02/27/2020) |
2020-03-24 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 03/24/2020) |
2020-03-25 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 6/12/2020, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/25/2020. (jag) (Entered: 03/25/2020) |
2020-06-12 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Schuster, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/12/2020) |
2020-06-29 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 8/11/2020, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/29/2020. (jag) (Entered: 06/29/2020) |
2020-08-11 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Schuster, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/11/2020) |
2020-08-24 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 9/10/2020, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/24/2020. (jag) (Entered: 08/24/2020) |
2020-09-02 | 21 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Joseph F. Carilli, Jr on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Paul A. Mussenden (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 09/02/2020) |
2020-09-10 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 09/10/2020) |
2020-09-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 22 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 10/13/2020, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/15/2020. (jag) (Entered: 09/15/2020) |
2020-10-13 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 10/13/2020) |
2020-10-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 23 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 1/11/2021, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/15/2020. (jag) (Entered: 10/15/2020) |
2021-01-11 | 24 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 01/11/2021) |
2021-01-19 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report, nunc pro tunc. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file their Joint Status Report on or before 1/21/2021. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/19/2021. (jag) (Entered: 01/19/2021) |
2021-01-20 | 25 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. Attorney Laurence M. Schwartztol terminated. (Goodman, Rachel) (Entered: 01/20/2021) |
2021-01-21 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 01/21/2021) |
2021-02-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 26 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 3/18/2021, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/16/2021. (jag) (Entered: 02/16/2021) |
2021-03-18 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 03/18/2021) |
2021-03-19 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 27 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that this matter remains stay and, on or before 5/17/2021, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/19/2021. (jag) (Entered: 03/19/2021) |
2021-05-17 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 05/17/2021) |
2021-06-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 28 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 7/16/2021, the parties shall file further joint status report, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/2/2021. (jag) (Entered: 06/02/2021) |
2021-06-28 | | Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson has been elevated to serve on the U.S. Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit. She is therefore no longer assigned to this case, and this matter has been reassigned to the Calendar Committee, which will oversee it until it is assigned to another district judge. Any questions should be directed to Judge Jackson's former deputy clerk, Gwendolyn Franklin, at 202-354-3145 or gwen_franklin@dcd.uscourts.gov. (rj) (Entered: 06/28/2021) |
2021-07-16 | 29 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Schuster, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/16/2021) |
2021-07-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/30/2021. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/20/2021. (zgdf) (Entered: 07/16/2021) |
Hide Docket Events |