Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-10-04 | 1 | COMPLAINT under FOIA against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12040973, filed by Monica Mosquera, Hector Hoyos. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s) Summons, # 3 Exhibit A - Copy of FOIA Acknowledgment Letter, NRC2018148462, February 16, 2019;, # 4 Exhibit B - Copy of FOIA Response, NRC2018148462;, # 5 Exhibit C - Copy of FOIA Appeal Acknowledgment Letter, AAP2019500117, May 29, 2019;, # 6 Exhibit D - NRC2016005656 FOIA Cover Letter and pertinent excerpts from response (pg. 31-42) for Hector Hoyos;)(Dominguez, Anthony) (Entered: 10/04/2019) |
2019-10-04 | 2 | Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 10/07/2019) |
2019-10-04 | 3 | Summons Issued as to William Barr, U.S. Attorney (mee) Modified to remove party on 10/7/2019 (asl). (Entered: 10/07/2019) |
2019-10-04 | 4 | (IMAGE RESTRICTED- Parties NOT LISTED ON COMPLAINT- ISSUED IN ERROR)Summons Issued as to Linda Swacina, Secretary U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (mee) Text Modified on 10/7/2019 (mee). Modified to restrict image on 10/7/2019 (asl). Modified text on 10/7/2019 (asl). (Entered: 10/07/2019) |
2019-10-04 | 5 | Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. (mee) Modified on 10/7/2019 (mee). (Entered: 10/07/2019) |
2019-10-04 | 6 | Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents. Summons issued at D.E. 4 restricted- parties not listed on complaint. (mee) Modified text on 10/7/2019 (asl). (Entered: 10/07/2019) |
2019-10-07 | 7 | NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Hector Hoyos, Monica Mosquera (Dominguez, Anthony) (Entered: 10/07/2019) |
2019-10-08 | 8 | Summons Issued as to William Barr, Kevin McAleenan and U.S. Attorney (cbr) (Entered: 10/08/2019) |
2019-10-08 | 9 | Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq) (Entered: 10/08/2019) |
2019-11-12 | 10 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 1 Complaint,, by William Barr, Francis Cissna, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Matthew D. Emrich, Kevin McAleenan, Secretary U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Linda Swacina. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party William Barr(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party Francis Cissna (pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party Kenneth Cuccinelli(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party Matthew D. Emrich(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party Kevin McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party Secretary U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party Linda Swacina(pty:dft). (Raurell, Carlos) (Entered: 11/12/2019) |
2019-11-14 | 11 | PAPERLESS ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/14/2019. (mws) (Entered: 11/14/2019) |
2019-12-11 | 12 | ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 9/28/2020 at 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 9/24/2020 at 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 8/19/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for all Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 12/11/2019) |
2019-12-11 | 13 | Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by William Barr, Francis Cissna, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Matthew D. Emrich, Kevin McAleenan, Secretary U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Linda Swacina. (Raurell, Carlos) (Entered: 12/11/2019) |
2020-01-22 | 14 | NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eduardo Rigoberto Soto on behalf of Hector Hoyos, Monica Mosquera. Attorney Eduardo Rigoberto Soto added to party Hector Hoyos(pty:pla), Attorney Eduardo Rigoberto Soto added to party Monica Mosquera(pty:pla). (Soto, Eduardo) (Entered: 01/22/2020) |
2020-01-23 | 15 | MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Anthony Dominguez for / by Hector Hoyos, Monica Mosquera. Responses due by 2/6/2020 (Dominguez, Anthony) (Entered: 01/23/2020) |
2020-03-25 | 16 | PAPERLESS ORDER granting 15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Anthony Richard Dominguez is withdrawn from this case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 3/25/2020. (jd00) (Entered: 03/25/2020) |
2020-06-26 | 17 | NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hector Hoyos, Monica Mosquera (Soto, Eduardo) (Entered: 06/26/2020) |
2020-06-26 | 18 | ORDER DISMISSING AND CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 06/28/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |