Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-10-01 | 1 | COMPLAINT against United States Drug Enforcement Administration ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683080997.), filed by John J. Coleman. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-01 | 2 | Summons Issued, certified mail, as to United States Drug Enforcement Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-01 | 3 | MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by John J. Coleman. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-01 | | Case Reassigned to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr. District Judge T. S. Ellis, III no longer assigned to the case. (aott, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-01 | 4 | ORDER granting 3 Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 10/01/2019. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-10-22 | 5 | SUMMONS Returned Executed. US Attorney's Office served on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/22/2019) |
2019-10-28 | 6 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by United States Drug Enforcement Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McCotter, R.) (Entered: 10/28/2019) |
2019-10-29 | 7 | ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. ORDERED that Defendant's time to respond to the Complaint is extended to December 6, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 10/29/19. (cmar, ) (Entered: 10/29/2019) |
2019-12-04 | 8 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint by United States Drug Enforcement Administration.(McCotter, R.) (Entered: 12/04/2019) |
2019-12-04 | 9 | STATUS REPORT JOINT by United States Drug Enforcement Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McCotter, R.) (Entered: 12/04/2019) |
2019-12-10 | 10 | ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report every 30 days apprising the Court of the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request that is the subject of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 12/10/2019. (See order for further details).(acha, ) Copy sent as directed in the order. (Entered: 12/11/2019) |
2020-01-03 | 11 | STATUS REPORT JOINT by United States Drug Enforcement Administration. (McCotter, R.) (Entered: 01/03/2020) |
2020-02-03 | 12 | STATUS REPORT JOINT by United States Drug Enforcement Administration. (Mezger, Matthew) (Entered: 02/03/2020) |
2020-03-02 | 13 | STATUS REPORT Joint by United States Drug Enforcement Administration. (Mezger, Matthew) (Entered: 03/02/2020) |
2020-03-12 | 14 | NOTICE by United States Drug Enforcement Administration Regarding Further Litigation (Mezger, Matthew) (Entered: 03/12/2020) |
2020-03-20 | 15 | STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by United States Drug Enforcement Administration. (Mezger, Matthew) (Entered: 03/20/2020) |
2020-03-26 | 16 | SO ORDERED re 15 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 3/26/2020. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 03/26/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |