Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2021-08-12 | 1 | COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8663226) filed by TRANSGENDER LAW CENTER, RAPID DEFENSE NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Summons to ICE, # 10 Summons to DOJ, # 11 Summons USAO, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2021) |
2021-08-12 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RAPID DEFENSE NETWORK, TRANSGENDER LAW CENTER (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2021) |
2021-08-12 | | Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/12/2021) |
2021-08-12 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/12/2021) |
2021-08-25 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/17/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/16/2021. (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 08/25/2021) |
2021-08-26 | 5 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RAPID DEFENSE NETWORK, TRANSGENDER LAW CENTER re 1 Complaint, 2 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests, 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA upon US Dep't of Justice by certified mail . (Kelley, Matthew) Modified on 8/26/2021 (zjf). (Entered: 08/26/2021) |
2021-08-26 | | NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 5 Certificate of Service, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED AS TO FEDERAL DFTS" event (zjf) (Entered: 08/26/2021) |
2021-09-03 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of All Defendants (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/03/2021) |
2021-09-16 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/16/2021) |
2021-09-16 | 8 | MOTION to Consolidate Cases by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/16/2021) |
2021-09-17 | 9 | RESPONSE re 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Consent to Consolidation filed by RAPID DEFENSE NETWORK, TRANSGENDER LAW CENTER. (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 09/17/2021) |
2021-09-23 | 10 | ORDER granting 8 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/23/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 09/23/2021) |
2021-09-23 | 11 | ORDER: The parties will file an initial Joint Status Report by 10/25/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/23/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 09/23/2021) |
2021-09-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/25/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 09/24/2021) |
2021-10-06 | | Cases Consolidated. Cases 21cv2153 and 21cv2155 have been consolidated, pursuant to an Order entered 09/23/2021. From this date forward, all pleadings shall be filed ONLY in the lead/earlier case, Civil Action No. 21-2153. (zjf) (Entered: 10/06/2021) |
2021-10-25 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 10/25/2021) |
2021-10-29 | 13 | ORDER: The parties shall file an further Joint Status Report by 12/9/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/29/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 10/29/2021) |
2021-11-08 | 14 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Kathleene A. Molen (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 11/08/2021) |
2021-12-09 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 12/09/2021) |
2021-12-10 | 16 | ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 2/9/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/10/2021.(lcrcl3) (Entered: 12/10/2021) |
2022-02-09 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 02/09/2022) |
2022-02-10 | 18 | ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 4/8/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/10/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 02/10/2022) |
2022-04-08 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 04/08/2022) |
2022-04-12 | 20 | ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 6/8/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/12/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 04/12/2022) |
2022-06-08 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 06/08/2022) |
2022-06-13 | 22 | ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 9/30/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/13/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 06/13/2022) |
2022-09-30 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 09/30/2022) |
2022-10-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further joint status report by 01/03/2023. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/03/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 10/03/2022) |
2023-01-03 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 01/03/2023) |
2023-01-04 | | MINUTE ORDER; Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report by 04/03/2023. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 01/04/2023. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 01/04/2023) |
2023-04-03 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 04/03/2023) |
2023-04-12 | 26 | ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further status report by 06/30/2023. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 04/12/2023. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 04/12/2023) |
2023-06-29 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 06/29/2023) |
2023-06-30 | 28 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT Substituting for attorney Derek S. Hammond (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/30/2023) |
2023-07-05 | 29 | ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by 09/29/2023. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/05/2023. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 07/05/2023) |
2023-09-29 | 30 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/29/2023) |
2023-10-03 | 31 | ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by 01/08/2024. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/03/2023. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 10/03/2023) |
2024-01-08 | 32 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/08/2024) |
2024-01-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by 04/08/2024. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 01/09/2024. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 01/09/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |