Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2021-08-24 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8688620) filed by MICHAEL KAPLAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Greim, Edward) (Entered: 08/24/2021) |
2021-08-25 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to edgreim@gravesgarrett.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) (Entered: 08/25/2021) |
2021-08-25 | 2 | ERRATA Complaint by MICHAEL KAPLAN. (Greim, Edward) (Entered: 08/25/2021) |
2021-08-26 | | Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 08/26/2021) |
2021-08-30 | 3 | SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021) |
2021-09-29 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 9/20/2021 (Greim, Edward) (Entered: 09/29/2021) |
2021-11-09 | 5 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by MICHAEL KAPLAN.(Greim, Edward) (Entered: 11/09/2021) |
2021-11-09 | 6 | SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (znmw) (Entered: 11/09/2021) |
2021-11-09 | 7 | SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 11/09/2021) |
2021-12-16 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 12/10/2021 (Greim, Edward) (Entered: 12/16/2021) |
2021-12-16 | 9 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/29/2021. (Greim, Edward) (Entered: 12/16/2021) |
2021-12-16 | 10 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/29/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/29/2021. (Greim, Edward) (Entered: 12/16/2021) |
2021-12-27 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Duffey on behalf of U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 12/27/2021) |
2021-12-29 | 12 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, with proposed order by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 12/29/2021) |
2021-12-30 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by January 31, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/30/2021. (lccrc2) (Entered: 12/30/2021) |
2022-01-31 | 13 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 01/31/2022) |
2022-02-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by 2/15/2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/1/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 02/01/2022) |
2022-02-15 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT with proposed order by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 02/15/2022) |
2022-02-16 | 15 | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further joint status report on or before April 15, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/16/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 02/16/2022) |
2022-04-15 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT with proposed order by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 04/15/2022) |
2022-04-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' latest 16 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further joint status report on or before June 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/18/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 04/18/2022) |
2022-06-16 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 06/16/2022) |
2022-06-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' latest 17 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further joint status report on or before August 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/21/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 06/21/2022) |
2022-08-16 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT with proposed order by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 08/16/2022) |
2022-08-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' latest 18 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further joint status report on or before October 17, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/17/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/17/2022) |
2022-10-17 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT with proposed order by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 10/17/2022) |
2022-10-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further status report by January 17, 2023. If there are still disputes between the parties at that time, the parties shall propose a briefing schedule for summary judgment motions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/18/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/18/2022) |
2023-01-13 | 20 | STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by MICHAEL KAPLAN. (Greim, Edward) (Entered: 01/13/2023) |
2023-01-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 20 stipulation of dismissal, the case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/17/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 01/17/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |