Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2021-08-25 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8690442) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons as to USAO, # 3 Summons as to AG, # 4 Summons as to DOD)(Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 08/25/2021) |
2021-08-25 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 08/25/2021) |
2021-08-26 | | Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 08/26/2021) |
2021-08-30 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021) |
2021-09-27 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/9/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/9/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/07/2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 9/3/2021 (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 09/27/2021) |
2021-10-07 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Anthony Quinn on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 10/07/2021) |
2021-10-08 | 6 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 10/08/2021) |
2021-10-11 | | MINUTE ORDER treating as opposed and granting Defendant's 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendant's 6 Motion is granted. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint by November 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/11/2021. (lctjk2) (Entered: 10/11/2021) |
2021-11-10 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 11/10/2021) |
2021-11-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a 1 complaint and an 7 answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by November 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/11/2021. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/11/2021) |
2021-11-29 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 11/29/2021) |
2021-11-29 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by January 20, 2022, updating the Court on the progress of the parties' discussions and including, if necessary, a jointly proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/29/2021. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/29/2021) |
2022-01-20 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 01/20/2022) |
2022-01-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by March 18, 2022, updating the Court on the progress of the parties' discussions and including, if necessary, a jointly proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 01/21/2022. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/21/2022) |
2022-03-18 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 03/18/2022) |
2022-03-19 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by May 24, 2022, updating the Court on the progress of the parties' discussions and including, if necessary, a jointly proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 03/19/2022. (lctjk2) (Entered: 03/19/2022) |
2022-05-24 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 05/24/2022) |
2022-05-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by June 24, 2022, updating the Court on the progress of the parties' discussions and including, if necessary, a jointly proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 05/25/2022. (lctjk2) (Entered: 05/25/2022) |
2022-06-24 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 06/24/2022) |
2022-06-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by July 25, 2022, updating the Court on the progress of the parties' discussions and including, if necessary, a jointly proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 06/27/2022. (lctjk2) (Entered: 06/27/2022) |
2022-07-25 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 07/25/2022) |
2022-07-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by August 26, 2022, updating the Court on the progress of the parties' discussions and including, if necessary, a joint schedule for briefing. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 07/26/2022. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/26/2022) |
2022-08-26 | 14 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 08/26/2022) |
2022-08-28 | | MINUTE ORDER treating as opposed and granting Defendant's 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Joint Status Report. It is hereby ORDERED, nunc pro tunc and for good cause shown, that Defendant's 14 Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the August 26, 2022 deadline to file the next joint status report in this case is CONTINUED to August 31, 2022. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 08/28/2022. (lctjk2) (Entered: 08/28/2022) |
2022-08-30 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 08/30/2022) |
2022-08-31 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by September 29, 2022, updating the Court on the progress of the parties' discussions and including, if necessary, a joint schedule for briefing. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 08/31/2022. (lctjk2) (Entered: 08/31/2022) |
2022-09-29 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 09/29/2022) |
2022-09-30 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by November 14, 2022, updating the Court on the progress of the parties' discussions and including, if necessary, a joint schedule for briefing. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 09/30/2022. (lctjk2) (Entered: 09/30/2022) |
2022-11-14 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 11/14/2022) |
2022-11-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by December 14, 2022, updating the Court on the progress of the parties' discussions and including, if necessary, a joint schedule for briefing. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/14/2022. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/14/2022) |
2022-12-13 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 12/13/2022) |
2022-12-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by February 21, 2023, updating the Court on the parties' progress and including, if necessary, a joint schedule for briefing. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/13/2022. (lctjk2) (Entered: 12/13/2022) |
2023-02-21 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-02-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by April 21, 2023, updating the Court on the parties' progress and including, if necessary, a joint schedule for briefing. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/22/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 02/22/2023) |
2023-04-21 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 04/21/2023) |
2023-04-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by June 21, 2023, updating the Court on the parties' progress and including, if necessary, a joint schedule for briefing. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/26/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 04/26/2023) |
2023-06-21 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 06/21/2023) |
2023-06-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 21 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by August 21, 2023, updating the Court on the parties' progress and including, if necessary, a joint schedule for briefing. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/22/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 06/22/2023) |
2023-07-18 | 22 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sam Escher on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Substituting for attorney Thomas Anthony Quinn (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 07/18/2023) |
2023-08-21 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 08/21/2023) |
2023-08-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 23 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by October 25, 2023, updating the Court on the parties' progress and including, if necessary, a joint schedule for briefing. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/22/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 08/22/2023) |
2023-10-24 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 10/24/2023) |
2023-10-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 24 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by January 10, 2024, updating the Court on the parties' progress and including, if necessary, a joint schedule for briefing. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/25/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 10/25/2023) |
2024-01-08 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 01/08/2024) |
2024-01-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 25 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by March 12, 2024, including, if necessary, a joint schedule for briefing. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/9/2024. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/09/2024) |
2024-03-12 | 26 | STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 03/12/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |