Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2021-08-27 | 1 | First PETITION (Complaint) To Enforce Freedom of Information Act Response RE: Government Agency . Filing fee $ 49.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14964182, filed by Luis Alfredo Anibal Coca. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s))(Smerdon, Bonnie) (Entered: 08/27/2021) |
2021-08-27 | 2 | Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 08/27/2021) |
2021-08-27 | 3 | Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Insufficient filing fee paid. Filer must file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee and electronically pay the correct fees of $ 402.00 within 24 hours. Filing fees will be refunded. Amount $49.00, receipt #AFLSDC-14964182, case filed date: 8/27/2021. (pcs) (Entered: 08/27/2021) |
2021-08-27 | 4 | Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Insufficient filing fee paid. (pcs) (Entered: 08/27/2021) |
2021-08-27 | 5 | Noticing INS Attorney Added for Defendants. (pcs) (Entered: 08/27/2021) |
2021-08-27 | 6 | Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee $402.00, receipt number AFLSDC-14964320, Electronic Civil Case Filing re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, (Smerdon, Bonnie) (Entered: 08/27/2021) |
2021-08-27 | 7 | Summons Issued as to Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pcs) (Entered: 08/27/2021) |
2021-09-22 | 8 | Clerks Notice of Filing Fee refunded to Bonnie Smerdon in the amount of $49.00 on 09/22/2021 re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, (mua) (Entered: 09/22/2021) |
2021-10-05 | 9 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 1 Petition (Complaint) RE: Government Agency, by Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States Department of Justice. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party Executive Office for Immigration Review(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party United States Department of Justice(pty:dft). (Raurell, Carlos) (Entered: 10/05/2021) |
2021-10-05 | 10 | PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part 9 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall have through and including October 26, 2021 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/5/2021. (cvl) (Entered: 10/05/2021) |
2021-10-08 | 11 | NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Luis Alfredo Anibal Coca (Smerdon, Bonnie) (Entered: 10/08/2021) |
Hide Docket Events |