Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2021-08-23 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Filing fee $ 402 Receipt Number 200483) filed by CHARISSA A. SMALLS, EUGENE C. SMALLS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eg) Modified on 9/3/2021 to add receipt information (eg). (Entered: 08/31/2021) |
2021-08-31 | | SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (eg) (Entered: 08/31/2021) |
2021-08-31 | 2 | STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 08/31/2021. (lctnm2) (Entered: 08/31/2021) |
2021-10-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs filed their Complaint in this case on August 23, 2021. As of the date of this Order, the public docket reflects that Plaintiffs have yet to file proof of service for the Defendant. The Court directs Plaintiffs' attention to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) and Local Civil Rule 5.3. It is hereby ORDERED that, by no later than November 21, 2021, Plaintiffs must either cause process to be served upon the Defendant and file proof of service with the Court or establish good cause for the failure to do so. Failure to make such filings will result in dismissal of this case as to any unserved Defendant. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/22/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 10/22/2021) |
2021-10-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's proof of service due by 11/21/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 10/22/2021) |
2021-11-05 | 3 | NOTICE by CHARISSA A. SMALLS, EUGENE C. SMALLS re Order,, (eg) (Entered: 11/12/2021) |
2021-11-15 | 4 | NOTICE by CHARISSA A. SMALLS, EUGENE C. SMALLS (zeg) (Entered: 11/19/2021) |
2021-11-15 | 5 | NEW Request Regarding Pro Se Consent To Receive Notices of Electronic Filing by CHARISSA A. SMALLS, EUGENE C. SMALLS (zeg) (Entered: 11/19/2021) |
2021-12-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court requests the Clerk of Court to send blank summonses to the Plaintiffs at their address of record or electronically. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(b), Plaintiffs shall complete those summonses and present them to the Clerk of the Court. Once the Clerk stamps the summonses, Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of their Complaint and the summonses on the Defendant as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Plaintiffs shall complete service by January 17, 2022. Failure to do so will likely result in dismissal of the case for failure to serve under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/10/21. (lctnm2) (Entered: 12/10/2021) |
2021-12-21 | 6 | NOTICE by CHARISSA A. SMALLS, EUGENE C. SMALLS (zeg) (Entered: 12/23/2021) |
2021-12-21 | 7 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by CHARISSA A. SMALLS, EUGENE C. SMALLS.(eg) (Entered: 12/23/2021) |
2021-12-23 | 8 | Summons (1) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (zeg) (Entered: 12/23/2021) |
2022-01-05 | 9 | NOTICE to the Court by CHARISSA A. SMALLS, EUGENE C. SMALLS (zeg) (Entered: 01/10/2022) |
2022-01-05 | 10 | MOTION for Extension of Time by CHARISSA A. SMALLS, EUGENE C. SMALLS. (Attachment: # 1 Order)(zeg) (Entered: 01/10/2022) |
2022-01-10 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall file proofs of service by January 27, 2022. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this case under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) for failure to serve. The Court also directs Plaintiffs to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i) regarding service on an agency of the United States. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/10/22. (lctnm2) (Entered: 01/10/2022) |
2022-01-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Proof of service due by 1/27/2022. (zhmc) (Entered: 01/11/2022) |
2022-01-14 | 11 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 1/4/2022 (zeg) (Entered: 01/20/2022) |
2022-01-19 | 12 | MOTION for Extension of Time by CHARISSA A. SMALLS, EUGENE C. SMALLS. (zeg) (Entered: 01/21/2022) |
2022-01-21 | | MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 12 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall file proof of service by February 10, 2022. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this case under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). No more extensions of time will be given. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/21/22. (lctnm2) (Entered: 01/21/2022) |
2022-01-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' proof of service due by 2/10/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 01/21/2022) |
2022-02-03 | 13 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 1/20/2022 (eg) (Entered: 02/07/2022) |
2022-02-18 | 14 | ORDER dismissing case under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) for failure to serve. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/18/22. (lctnm2) (Entered: 02/18/2022) |
Hide Docket Events |