Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2021-10-06 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8784998) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Defense)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/06/2021) |
2021-10-06 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/06/2021) |
2021-10-07 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 10/07/2021) |
2021-10-12 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 10/12/2021) |
2021-10-18 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/13/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/12/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/18/2021) |
2021-10-18 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/18/21. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/18/2021) |
2021-10-18 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 10/18/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/18/2021) |
2021-11-12 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Colsia, Jessica) (Entered: 11/12/2021) |
2021-11-12 | 8 | NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica B. Colsia on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Colsia, Jessica) (Entered: 11/12/2021) |
2021-11-15 | 9 | ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before December 13, 2021. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/15/2021. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/15/2021) |
2021-12-13 | 10 | STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Colsia, Jessica) (Entered: 12/13/2021) |
2021-12-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of 10 defendant's status report, the parties must file a joint status report by February 11, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/15/2021. (lcabj2) (Entered: 12/15/2021) |
2022-02-10 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by John Haberland on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Haberland, John) (Entered: 02/10/2022) |
2022-02-10 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Haberland, John) (Entered: 02/10/2022) |
2022-02-13 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 12 joint status report, the parties must file another joint status report by April 8, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/13/2022. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/13/2022) |
2022-04-07 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haberland, John) (Entered: 04/07/2022) |
2022-04-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 13 joint status report, the parties must file another joint status report by June 8, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 04/08/2022. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/08/2022) |
2022-06-07 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haberland, John) (Entered: 06/07/2022) |
2022-06-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of 14 the recent joint status report, the parties must file another joint status report by August 8, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/8/22. (DMK) (Entered: 06/08/2022) |
2022-07-18 | 15 | PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Order, Set Deadlines by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haberland, John) (Entered: 07/18/2022) |
2022-07-19 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 15 joint status report, it is ORDERED that defendant's motion for summary judgment will be due by September 23, 2022; plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment will be due by October 28, 2022; defendant's reply and cross-opposition will be due by November 18, 2022; and plaintiff's cross-reply will be due by December 9, 2022. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/19/2022. (lcabj2) (Entered: 07/19/2022) |
2022-09-19 | 16 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file MSJ by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haberland, John) (Entered: 09/19/2022) |
2022-09-20 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the 16 Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that defendant's motion for summary judgment will be due by October 24, 2022; plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment will be due by December 5, 2022; defendant's reply and cross-opposition will be due by January 9, 2023; and plaintiff's cross-reply will be due by January 30, 2023. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/20/2022. (lcabj2) (Entered: 09/20/2022) |
2022-10-19 | 17 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File MSJ by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haberland, John) (Entered: 10/19/2022) |
2022-10-20 | 18 | ERRATA by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE re 17 Motion for Extension of Time to. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haberland, John) (Entered: 10/20/2022) |
2022-10-20 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the 17 Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that defendant's motion for summary judgment will be due by December 2, 2022; plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment will be due by January 17, 2023; defendant's reply and cross-opposition will be due by February 15, 2023; and plaintiff's cross-reply will be due by March 8, 2023. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/20/2022. (lcabj2) (Entered: 10/20/2022) |
2022-11-28 | 19 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion for Summary Judgement by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haberland, John) (Entered: 11/28/2022) |
2022-11-29 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the 19 Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that defendant's motion for summary judgment will be due by January 17, 2023; plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment will be due by March 3, 2023; defendant's reply and cross-opposition will be due by April 3, 2023; and plaintiff's cross-reply will be due by April 24, 2023. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/29/2022. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/29/2022) |
2023-01-13 | 20 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 01/13/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |