Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2021-11-02 | 1 | COMPLAINT against Defendant The Central Intelligence Agency. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym., filed by plaintiff Richard R. Lawless. (Attachments: # 1 CV-71) (ghap) (Entered: 11/02/2021) |
2021-11-02 | 2 | APPLICATION to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, filed by plaintiff Richard R. Lawless. (ghap) (Entered: 11/02/2021) |
2021-11-02 | 3 | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap) (Entered: 11/02/2021) |
2021-11-02 | 4 | NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 11/02/2021) |
2021-11-02 | 5 | Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 11/02/2021) |
2021-11-03 | 6 | ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby GRANTED. Granting 2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (es) (Entered: 11/04/2021) |
2021-11-10 | 7 | 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), 1 as to Defendant The Central Intelligence Agency. (twdb) (Entered: 11/10/2021) |
2021-11-15 | 8 | STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 11/15/2021) |
2021-12-05 | 9 | PROOF OF SERVICE - ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Richard R. Lawless, re Complaint - (Discovery), 1 , Summons Issued 7 served on 12/3/21. (es) (Entered: 12/07/2021) |
2022-01-06 | 10 | ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:21-cv-01637-JWH(SPx). Case transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:21-cv-01857-JWH(SPx). Signed by Judge John W. Holcomb (ap) (Entered: 01/06/2022) |
2022-01-12 | 11 | This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John W. Holcomb, United States District Judge. Judge Holcomb is located in Courtroom 2, on the 2nd Floor of the George E. Brown, Jr. Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 3470 Twelfth Street, Riverside, California 92501. Additional information regarding Judge Holcomb's procedures and schedules is available on the Court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/12/2022) |
2022-01-13 | 12 | STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 01/13/2022) |
2022-01-13 | 13 | Text Only Entry - IN CHAMBERS by Judge John W. Holcomb: Notice Regarding Electronic Document Submission System for People Without Lawyers. People who are not represented by attorneys may now submit documents for filing through the Court's Electronic Document Submission System ("EDSS") instead of mailing or bringing documents to the Clerk's Office. EDSS is not the same as filing documents electronically in the Court's CM/ECF System. Registration is not required to use EDSS and you do not need a PACER account; only internet access and an e-mail address are required. Attorneys may not use EDSS to submit documents on behalf of their clients. To access EDSS and for additional information, visit the Court's website at https://apps.cacd.uscourts.gov/edss. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/13/2022) |
2022-01-13 | 14 | SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 01/13/2022) |
2022-02-04 | 15 | NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge John W. Holcomb, ORDERING Request for Default Judgment submitted by Plaintiff Richard R. Lawless received on 2/3/2022 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: LR 11-3.2 (See document for further details). (yl) (Entered: 02/04/2022) |
2022-02-08 | 16 | REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant The Central Intelligence Agency filed by Plaintiff Richard R. Lawless. (yl) (Entered: 02/09/2022) |
2022-02-08 | 17 | NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant The Central Intelligence Agency 16 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Proof of Service is lacking required information. The acknowledgement of service is not signed. (yl) (Entered: 02/09/2022) |
2022-02-08 | 18 | MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court, on its own motion, hereby orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before March 1, 2022, why this action should not be dismissed, with respect to each Defendant who has not filed an answer or otherwise responded to the complaint. (See document for further details) (yl) (Entered: 02/09/2022) |
2022-02-09 | 19 | REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant The Central Intelligence Agency filed by Plaintiff Richard R. Lawless. (yl) (Entered: 02/14/2022) |
2022-02-09 | 20 | REQUEST to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Richard R. Lawless. (yl) (Entered: 02/14/2022) |
Hide Docket Events |