Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-03-14 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9102082) filed by ADAM MALIK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elmazi, Blerim) (Entered: 03/14/2022) |
2022-03-14 | 2 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by ADAM MALIK.(Elmazi, Blerim) (Entered: 03/14/2022) |
2022-03-15 | | Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmh) (Entered: 03/15/2022) |
2022-03-15 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 2 Request for Summons to Issue; emailed to blerim@elmazilaw.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (zmh, ) (Entered: 03/15/2022) |
2022-03-15 | 3 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by ADAM MALIK.(Elmazi, Blerim) (Entered: 03/15/2022) |
2022-03-16 | 4 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (14) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) Modified on 3/24/2022 (znmw). (Entered: 03/16/2022) |
2022-03-16 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 3 Request for Summons to Issue; emailed to blerim@elmazilaw.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue., 2. Please use the FOIA summons at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/Summons-FOIA_2013_FILL.pdf (zsb, ) (Entered: 03/16/2022) |
2022-03-24 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 3/21/2022; DAVID FERRIERO served on 3/18/2022; UR MENDOZA JADDOU served on 3/22/2022; TAE JOHNSON served on 3/22/2022; CHRIS MAGNUS served on 3/24/2022; ADAM MALIK served on 3/24/2022; ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 3/21/2022; NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION served on 3/18/2022; U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 3/22/2022; U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 3/21/2022; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/22/2022; U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 3/22/2022; CHRISTOPHER WRAY served on 3/21/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Elmazi, Blerim) (Entered: 03/24/2022) |
2022-05-04 | 6 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DAVID FERRIERO, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, TAE JOHNSON, CHRIS MAGNUS, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, CHRISTOPHER WRAY. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 05/04/2022) |
2022-05-05 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time For Filing Answer, Nunc Pro Tunc . Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by May 23, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/5/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/05/2022) |
2022-05-23 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DAVID FERRIERO, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, TAE JOHNSON, CHRIS MAGNUS, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, CHRISTOPHER WRAY.(Moustakas, John) (Entered: 05/23/2022) |
2022-05-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by June 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/24/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 05/24/2022) |
2022-06-07 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DAVID FERRIERO, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, TAE JOHNSON, CHRIS MAGNUS, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, CHRISTOPHER WRAY. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 06/07/2022) |
2022-06-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 8 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further joint status report by August 11, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/10/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 06/10/2022) |
2022-08-11 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADAM MALIK. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Elmazi, Blerim) (Entered: 08/11/2022) |
2022-08-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 9 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further joint status report by October 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/12/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/12/2022) |
2022-09-08 | 10 | Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ADAM MALIK. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Elmazi, Blerim) (Entered: 09/08/2022) |
2022-09-08 | | MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's 10 Motion to Withdraw Attorney is hereby GRANTED. Attorney Blerim Elmazi is terminated from the case. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/8/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 09/08/2022) |
2022-09-12 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Malik on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Malik, Adam) (Entered: 09/12/2022) |
2022-10-12 | 12 | STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DAVID FERRIERO, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, TAE JOHNSON, CHRIS MAGNUS, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, CHRISTOPHER WRAY. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 10/12/2022) |
2022-10-12 | 13 | STATUS REPORT Plaintiff Status Report with Proposed Order by ADAM MALIK. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Malik, Adam) (Entered: 10/12/2022) |
2022-10-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 12 13 Joint Status Reports, the parties are hereby directed to submit another report by December 12, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/14/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/14/2022) |
2022-11-28 | 14 | Mail Returned as Undeliverable re Minute Order issued on 10/14/2022. New address not provided; unable to forward. (lsj) (Entered: 11/28/2022) |
2022-12-07 | 15 | STATUS REPORT Plaintiff Status Report without Proposed Order by ADAM MALIK. (Malik, Adam) (Entered: 12/07/2022) |
2022-12-07 | 16 | NOTICE of Change of Address by Adam Malik (Malik, Adam) (Entered: 12/07/2022) |
2022-12-13 | 17 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Status Report by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DAVID FERRIERO, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, TAE JOHNSON, CHRIS MAGNUS, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, CHRISTOPHER WRAY. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 12/13/2022) |
2022-12-14 | | MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Status Report. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's status report by January 6, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/14/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 12/14/2022) |
2023-01-06 | 18 | STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DAVID FERRIERO, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, TAE JOHNSON, CHRIS MAGNUS, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, CHRISTOPHER WRAY. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 01/06/2023) |
2023-01-08 | 19 | MOTION for Vaughn Index by ADAM MALIK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Malik, Adam) (Entered: 01/08/2023) |
2023-01-12 | | Minute Order: The Court has reviewed 15 Plaintiff's Status Report and 18 Defendants' Response. The Court hereby orders Defendants to provide Plaintiff with draft Vaughn indexes on or before March 17, 2023. The parties shall then meet and confer and file, by April 14, 2023, a joint status report summarizing any remaining disputes and, if disputes remain, a schedule for prompt summary judgment briefing. Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Vaughn Index is denied as moot. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/12/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 01/12/2023) |
2023-04-12 | 20 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DAVID FERRIERO, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, TAE JOHNSON, CHRIS MAGNUS, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, CHRISTOPHER WRAY. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 04/12/2023) |
2023-04-14 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Joint Status Report. The parties shall file a status report by May 2, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/14/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 04/14/2023) |
2023-05-01 | 21 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Status Report by ADAM MALIK. (Malik, Adam) (Entered: 05/01/2023) |
2023-05-02 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. The parties shall file a joint status report by June 2, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/2/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/02/2023) |
2023-06-01 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DAVID FERRIERO, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, TAE JOHNSON, CHRIS MAGNUS, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, CHRISTOPHER WRAY. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 06/01/2023) |
2023-06-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 22 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further report by August 29, 2023. The parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule with their August status report in the event that disputes remain. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/5/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 06/05/2023) |
2023-08-29 | 23 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DAVID FERRIERO, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, TAE JOHNSON, CHRIS MAGNUS, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, CHRISTOPHER WRAY. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 08/29/2023) |
2023-08-31 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. The parties shall submit their joint status report by September 19, 2023. The parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule with their September status report in the event that disputes remain. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/31/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/31/2023) |
2023-09-19 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DAVID FERRIERO, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, TAE JOHNSON, CHRIS MAGNUS, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, CHRISTOPHER WRAY. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 09/19/2023) |
2023-09-20 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of 24 the parties' Joint Status Report, the Court directs the parties to submit a proposed briefing schedule by September 29, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/20/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 09/20/2023) |
2023-09-29 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DAVID FERRIERO, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, TAE JOHNSON, CHRIS MAGNUS, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, CHRISTOPHER WRAY. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 09/29/2023) |
2023-10-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: Given the long delay in summary judgment briefing proposed in the parties' latest status report, the parties are directed to file a joint notice by October 6, 2023 indicating whether they would be willing to use that time to engage in mediation before the D.C. Circuit Executive's mediation program. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/2/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/02/2023) |
2023-10-06 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DAVID FERRIERO, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, TAE JOHNSON, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, CHRISTOPHER WRAY. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 10/06/2023) |
2023-10-12 | | MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: In light of the parties' 26 Joint Status Report, the Court hereby refers this case to mediation with the Circuit Executive Mediation Program for a period of 90 days. The parties should contact the program office at (202) 216-7350 to schedule the mediation. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report at the conclusion of the 90-day period. In the event that disputes remain, the Court adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule as set forth in the parties' 25 Joint Status Report: Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion is due February 5, 2024; Plaintiff's Combined Opposition to Defendant's Motion and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is due March 6, 2024; Defendant's Combined Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion is due April 5, 2024; and Plaintiff's Reply is due May 6, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/12/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/12/2023) |
2023-12-27 | 27 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sam Escher on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney John Moustakas (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 12/27/2023) |
2024-01-31 | 28 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Briefing by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DAVID FERRIERO, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, TAE JOHNSON, CHRIS MAGNUS, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, CHRISTOPHER WRAY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Escher, Sam) Modified on 2/1/2024 Amended Motion filed at entry 29 (zjm). (Entered: 01/31/2024) |
2024-01-31 | 29 | Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Briefing by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DAVID FERRIERO, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, TAE JOHNSON, CHRIS MAGNUS, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, CHRISTOPHER WRAY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Escher, Sam) (Entered: 01/31/2024) |
2024-02-01 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Defendants' Amended Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' motion for summary judgment shall be due by March 6, 2024; Plaintiff's combined opposition and cross motion shall be due by April 5, 2024; Defendants' combined reply and opposition shall be due by May 6, 2024; and Plaintiff's reply, if any, shall be due by June 5, 2024. Further extension requests will be disfavored. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/1/2024. (lccrc2) (Entered: 02/01/2024) |
2024-03-06 | 30 | MOTION for Leave to File Declarations Under Seal and Ex Parte, In Camera by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Escher, Sam) (Entered: 03/06/2024) |
2024-03-06 | 31 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 CBP - Declaration and Exhibits, # 3 USCIS - Declaration, # 4 USCIS - Vaughn Index, # 5 ICE - Declaration, # 6 ICE - Vaughn Index, # 7 FBI - Declaration and Exhibits, # 8 NARA - Declaration and Exhibits, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Escher, Sam) (Entered: 03/06/2024) |
2024-03-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff shall file any opposition to 30 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Declarations Under Seal and Ex Parte, In Camera by March 15, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/11/2024. (lccrc2) (Entered: 03/11/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |
|