Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-06-02 | 1 | COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9276349) filed by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Proposed to USAO, USAG, and FERC)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 06/02/2022) |
2022-06-02 | | Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 06/02/2022) |
2022-06-03 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 06/03/2022) |
2022-06-03 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH (Horner, Christopher) (Main Document 3 flattened and replaced on 6/6/2022) (ztnr). (Entered: 06/03/2022) |
2022-06-30 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 06/30/2022) |
2022-06-30 | 5 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 06/30/2022) |
2022-07-05 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by July 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/5/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 07/05/2022) |
2022-07-28 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION.(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 07/28/2022) |
2022-07-29 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by August 12, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/29/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 07/29/2022) |
2022-08-02 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/02/2022) |
2022-08-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 7 joint status report, the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before October 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/3/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/03/2022) |
2022-10-03 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 10/03/2022) |
2022-10-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 8 joint status report, the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before November 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/4/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/04/2022) |
2022-11-16 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 11/16/2022) |
2022-11-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 9 joint status report, the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before January 17, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/18/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 11/18/2022) |
2023-01-17 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 01/17/2023) |
2023-01-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a further status report on or before February 16, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/18/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 01/18/2023) |
2023-02-16 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 02/16/2023) |
2023-02-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a further status report by March 31, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/18/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 02/18/2023) |
2023-03-07 | 12 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Curteman, Dedra) Modified on 3/7/2023 filed in incorrect case, counsel will file in correct case (zjm). (Entered: 03/07/2023) |
2023-03-31 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 03/31/2023) |
2023-04-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further report by April 30, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/3/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 04/03/2023) |
2023-04-28 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 04/28/2023) |
2023-04-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a further report by May 30, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/28/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 04/28/2023) |
2023-05-30 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 05/30/2023) |
2023-05-31 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further report by July 31, 2023. If disputes remain, the parties shall propose a briefing schedule for summary judgment in their July status report. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/31/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/31/2023) |
2023-07-31 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 07/31/2023) |
2023-08-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further status report by August 30, 2023. In the event disputes persist, the Court sets the following schedule for summary judgment briefing: Defendant shall file its summary judgment motion by October 30, 2023; Plaintiff shall file its combined opposition to Defendant's motion and any cross-motion for summary judgment by November 29, 2023; Defendant shall file its combined reply and opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion by December 22, 2023; and Plaintiff shall file any reply by January 19, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/1/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/01/2023) |
2023-08-30 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/30/2023) |
2023-08-31 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a further report by October 2, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/31/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/31/2023) |
2023-09-28 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 09/28/2023) |
2023-09-29 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a further report by November 1, 2023. The briefing schedule set forth in the Court's August 1, 2023 minute order is hereby vacated. The Court encourages the parties to complete their negotiations. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/29/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 09/29/2023) |
2023-10-30 | 19 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 10/30/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |