Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-06-07 | 1 | COMPLAINT against Defending the Republic filed by Defending the Republic. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12876186) Clerk to issue summons(es) for federal defendant(s). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements and Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3) (Holmes, Robert) (Entered: 06/07/2022) |
2022-06-07 | 2 | CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defending the Republic. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Holmes, Robert) (Entered: 06/07/2022) |
2022-06-07 | 3 | ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS (Civil Cover Sheet) to 1 Complaint by Plaintiff Defending the Republic. (Holmes, Robert) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/7/2022 to flatten image) (sxf). Modified on 6/7/2022 (sxf). (Entered: 06/07/2022) |
2022-06-07 | 4 | New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sxf) (Entered: 06/07/2022) |
2022-06-07 | 5 | Summons issued as to Food and Drug Administration, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (sxf) (Entered: 06/08/2022) |
2022-06-14 | 6 | Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12892869) filed by Defending the Republic (Attachments: # 1 Cert of Good Standing)Attorney Travis Wilson Miller added to party Defending the Republic(pty:pla) (Miller, Travis) (Entered: 06/14/2022) |
2022-06-15 | 7 | ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Travis Wilson Miller. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 6/15/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 06/15/2022) |
2022-06-16 | 8 | AMENDED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to by Defending the Republic. (Miller, Travis) Modified text on 6/17/2022 (jmg). (Entered: 06/16/2022) |
2022-06-27 | 9 | PROOF of Service as to Food and Drug Administration, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General, served on 6/15/2022. (Miller, Travis) Modified event on 6/28/2022 (ygl). (Entered: 06/27/2022) |
2022-06-30 | 10 | Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12931572) filed by Defending the Republic (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Exhibit(s))Attorney Brandon Johnson added to party Defending the Republic(pty:pla) (Johnson, Brandon) (Entered: 06/30/2022) |
2022-07-01 | 11 | ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brandon Johnson. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 7/1/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 07/01/2022) |
2022-07-15 | 12 | NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcia K Sowles on behalf of Food and Drug Administration. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 07/15/2022) |
2022-07-15 | 13 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint filed by Food and Drug Administration. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 07/15/2022) |
2022-07-15 | 14 | CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Food and Drug Administration. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Sowles, Marcia) (Main Document 14 replaced with flattened PDF on 7/18/2022) (ygl). (Entered: 07/15/2022) |
2022-07-19 | 15 | STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report Due Three (3) Weeks from the Date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 7/19/2022) (oyh) (Entered: 07/19/2022) |
2022-08-08 | 16 | Joint MOTION to Extend Time to file a Joint Report pursuant to the Court's Order dated July 13, 2022 filed by Food and Drug Administration (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 08/08/2022) |
2022-08-09 | 17 | ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 16 JOINT MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE STATUS REPORT. The parties deadline to file a joint status report is extended to August 16, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 8/9/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 08/09/2022) |
2022-08-16 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Food and Drug Administration. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 08/16/2022) |
2022-09-06 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Food and Drug Administration. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 09/06/2022) |
2022-09-28 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Food and Drug Administration. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 09/28/2022) |
2022-09-29 | 21 | ELECTRONIC ORDER Granting #20 Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Status Report. Status Report due 10/18/2022. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 9/29/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 09/29/2022) |
2022-10-18 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Food and Drug Administration. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 10/18/2022) |
2022-11-10 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Defending the Republic. (Miller, Travis) (Entered: 11/10/2022) |
2022-12-19 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Defending the Republic. (Miller, Travis) (Entered: 12/19/2022) |
2023-01-23 | 25 | Joint MOTION Requesting the Court to Enter an Order Setting Briefing Schedule filed by Defending the Republic (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Miller, Travis) (Entered: 01/23/2023) |
2023-03-02 | 26 | ELECTRONIC ORDER: Before the Court is the parties' Joint Motion Requesting the Court to Enter an Order Setting a Briefing Schedule (Doc. No. 25). The Court GRANTS the Motion and orders the following: Plaintiff will file its brief and any declaration(s) and/or other exhibits in support of its proposed production schedule by April 3, 2023 . Defendant will file its opposition and any declaration(s) and/or other exhibits in support of its proposed production schedule by May 3, 2023 . Each party's brief shall be no more than 35 pages in length. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 3/2/2023) (chmb) (Entered: 03/02/2023) |
2023-03-31 | 27 | Joint MOTION to Vacate and Joint Status Report filed by Defending the Republic (Miller, Travis) (Entered: 03/31/2023) |
2023-03-31 | 28 | ELECTRONIC ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE - Before the Court is the Parties' Joint Status Report and Motion to Vacate Briefing Schedule (ECF. No. 26). The Motion is GRANTED and the Briefing Schedule is VACATED. There appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as open for statistical purposes. The Clerk is therefore instructed to submit a JS-6 form to the Administrative Office, thereby removing this case from the statistical records. Nothing in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this case, and should further proceedings become necessary or desirable, any party or the Court may initiate such further proceedings in the same manner as if this Order had not been entered. The Parties shall file a Joint Report with the Court regarding the status of production no later than January 5, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 3/31/2023) (chmb) (Entered: 03/31/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |