Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-06-27 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9332368) filed by NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stichman, Barton) (Entered: 06/27/2022) |
2022-06-27 | | Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmh) (Entered: 06/27/2022) |
2022-06-27 | 2 | SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 06/27/2022) |
2022-06-27 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to bart@nvlsp.org, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (zmh, ) (Entered: 06/27/2022) |
2022-06-27 | 3 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Stichman, Barton) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/28/2022) (zjm). (Entered: 06/27/2022) |
2022-06-27 | 4 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to US Attorney General and US Attorney's Office re 1 Complaint filed by NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Attachments: # 1 Summons US Atty Office)(Stichman, Barton) (Entered: 06/27/2022) |
2022-06-28 | 5 | SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjm) (Entered: 06/28/2022) |
2022-08-02 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Kirstie Oblea on behalf of All Defendants (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 08/02/2022) |
2022-08-02 | 7 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 08/02/2022) |
2022-08-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court grants the 7 Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before September 19, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/2/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 08/02/2022) |
2022-09-12 | 8 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 09/12/2022) |
2022-09-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court grants the 8 Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before November 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/14/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/14/2022) |
2022-10-28 | 9 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 10/28/2022) |
2022-11-01 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by November 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/1/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 11/01/2022) |
2022-11-17 | 10 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 11/17/2022) |
2022-11-18 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by November 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/18/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 11/18/2022) |
2022-11-22 | 11 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 11/22/2022) |
Hide Docket Events |