Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-07-06 | 1 | COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9352768) filed by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 07/06/2022) |
2022-07-11 | | Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-07-11 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-07-29 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 07/29/2022) |
2022-08-15 | 4 | ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 08/15/2022) |
2022-08-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by August 29, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/15/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/15/2022) |
2022-08-29 | 5 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 08/29/2022) |
2022-08-30 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 5 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by October 6, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/30/2022. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 08/30/2022) |
2022-08-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: JSR due by 10/6/2022. (nbn) Modified deadline type on 8/30/2022 (nbn). (Entered: 08/30/2022) |
2022-08-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/6/2022. (znbn) (Entered: 08/30/2022) |
2022-10-06 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 10/06/2022) |
2022-10-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 6 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by November 17, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/6/2022. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 10/06/2022) |
2022-10-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/17/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 10/06/2022) |
2022-11-15 | 7 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 11/15/2022) |
2022-11-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 7 Stipulation, the Court ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/15/2022. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/15/2022) |
Hide Docket Events |