Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-07-11 | 1 | COMPLAINT against BLACKOUT, BULBHEAD, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DEB HAALAND, RING DOORBELL COMPANY, SWITCHBLADE DRONE, UNITED STATE POSTAL SERVICE, UNITED STATES PATENT TRADEMARK OFFICE, USPTO, filed by EZEKIEL I. TAYLOR, SR. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(JSR) (Entered: 07/12/2022) |
2022-07-11 | 2 | MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff EZEKIEL I. TAYLOR, SR. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(JSR) (Entered: 07/12/2022) |
2022-07-12 | 3 | MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JSR) (Entered: 07/12/2022) |
2022-07-13 | 4 | NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (AKH) (Entered: 07/13/2022) |
2022-07-18 | 5 | CLOSED TRANSFER to Northern District of Indiana, South Bend Division. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/18/2022.(AKH) (Entered: 07/19/2022) |
2022-07-18 | 6 | Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Indiana. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Indiana, on July 18, 2022. (AKH) (Entered: 07/19/2022) |
2022-07-21 | | The Southern District of Indiana receives email notice from the Clerk of the Northern District of Indiana regarding electronic case transfer. This case was received electronically by the Northern District of Indiana on 7/21/2022 and was assigned case number 3:22-cv-00573. (AKH) (Entered: 07/21/2022) |
2022-07-25 | 7 | REQUEST for permission to e-file and CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by EZEKIEL I. TAYLOR, SR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Envelope)(AKH) Modified on 7/26/2022 (TRG). (Entered: 07/25/2022) |
2022-08-02 | 8 | ORDER denying 7 Motion to e-file and consent to jurisdiction. However, this Court closed and transferred this case to the Northern District on July 18, 2022 and has been assigned case number 3:22-cv-573. [Filing No. 5; Filing No. 6.] As such, Plaintiff's request is DENIED without prejudice to re-file in the Northern District case. Further, the Clerk is directed to send a copy of the docket, and Filing Nos. 5 and 6, with the distribution of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 8/2/2022 Copies sent to Mr. Taylor via US Mail (Attachments: # 1 PUBLIC DOCKET SHEET, # 2 Docket Entry 5, # 3 Docket Entry 6) (CBU) (Entered: 08/03/2022) |
Hide Docket Events |