Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-07-11 | 1 | COMPLAINT against Office of Information and Privacy. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3089689.), filed by Leslie Zyzda-Martin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Feb 28, 2022 Request, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - March 2, 2022 follow up request, # 3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons) (Behm, Lili) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-07-11 | | Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-07-11 | | Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: NORTC , Corporate Disclosure Statement . (lak) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-07-11 | 2 | Summons Issued as to Office of Information and Privacy. (lak) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-08-15 | 3 | Notice of Attorney Substitution filed by Albert Bianchi, Jr for Defendant Office of Information and Privacy. Attorney Leslie K. Herje terminated. (Bianchi, Albert) (Entered: 08/15/2022) |
2022-08-15 | 4 | ANSWER by Defendant Office of Information and Privacy. (Bianchi, Albert) (Entered: 08/15/2022) |
2022-08-16 | | Set Telephone Pretrial : Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2022 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [ Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc) (Entered: 08/16/2022) |
2022-09-08 | 5 | Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Behm, Lili) (Entered: 09/08/2022) |
2022-09-15 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 9/13/2022 [:10] (cak) (Entered: 09/15/2022) |
2022-09-15 | 6 | Pretrial Conference Order - Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Dispositive Motions due 6/6/2023. Motions in Limine due 10/6/2023. Responses due 10/20/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2023 at 02:30 PM. Court Trial set for 11/13/2023 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/15/22. (jat) (Entered: 09/15/2022) |
2022-09-15 | | Set Deadlines: First Joint Report due 11/1/2022. (jat) (Entered: 09/15/2022) |
2022-11-01 | 7 | Status Report by Plaintiff Leslie Zyzda-Martin (Behm, Lili) (Entered: 11/01/2022) |
2022-11-02 | | Set Deadlines: Second Joint Status Report due 1/3/2023. (jat) (Entered: 11/02/2022) |
2023-01-03 | 8 | Status Report (Joint) by Plaintiff Leslie Zyzda-Martin (Behm, Lili) (Entered: 01/03/2023) |
2023-01-04 | | Set Deadlines: Third Joint Status Report due 3/7/2023. (jat) (Entered: 01/04/2023) |
2023-03-07 | 9 | Status Report by Plaintiff Leslie Zyzda-Martin (Behm, Lili) (Entered: 03/07/2023) |
2023-05-08 | 10 | Status Report (Joint) by Plaintiff Leslie Zyzda-Martin (Behm, Lili) (Entered: 05/08/2023) |
2023-05-31 | 11 | Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time of Dispositive Motion Deadline by Defendant Office of Information and Privacy. (Bianchi, Albert) (Entered: 05/31/2023) |
2023-05-31 | 12 | ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time. The new dispositive motion deadline is August 7, 2023. For now, the rest of the schedule remains in place. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/31/2023. (voc) (Entered: 05/31/2023) |
2023-07-06 | 13 | Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time by Defendant Office of Information and Privacy. (Bianchi, Albert) (Entered: 07/06/2023) |
2023-07-06 | 14 | ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Granting 13 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to file dispositive motions is moved to September 7, 2023. This requires pushing back the remainder of the schedule: submissions for the final pretrial conference are due December 8, 2023, responses by December 22, 2023. The final pretrial conference will be January 16, 2024 at 2:30, with the bench trial starting at 9:00 a.m. on January 24, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/6/2023. (voc) (Entered: 07/06/2023) |
2023-10-04 | 15 | STIPULATION of Dismissal (Halstead, Aaron) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-04 | | Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (nln) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |