Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-07-14 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF ARMY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9372182) filed by CALVIN GIBBS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Dept. of the Army, # 4 Summons US Attorney for DC, # 5 Summons Dept. of Justice)(Maher, John) Modified on 7/18/2022 to edit description of attachment #2 (znmg). (Entered: 07/14/2022) |
2022-07-18 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to john@maherlegalservices.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Attorney is provisional. Please renew your membership. See https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information., 3. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue., 4. Missing Related Case form. Please submit using the event Notice of Related Case., 5. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, ) (Entered: 07/18/2022) |
2022-07-18 | 2 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by CALVIN GIBBS.(Maher, John) Modified on 7/19/2022 (znmg). (Entered: 07/18/2022) |
2022-07-18 | 3 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by CALVIN GIBBS.(Maher, John) Modified on 7/19/2022 (znmg). (Entered: 07/18/2022) |
2022-07-18 | 4 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by CALVIN GIBBS.(Maher, John) Modified on 7/19/2022 (znmg). (Entered: 07/18/2022) |
2022-07-18 | 5 | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CALVIN GIBBS. Case related to Case No. 5:20-cv-03041-JWL. (Maher, John) (Entered: 07/18/2022) |
2022-07-18 | 6 | ERRATA by CALVIN GIBBS. (Maher, John) (Entered: 07/18/2022) |
2022-07-18 | 7 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by CALVIN GIBBS.(Maher, John) (Entered: 07/18/2022) |
2022-07-18 | 8 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by CALVIN GIBBS.(Maher, John) (Entered: 07/18/2022) |
2022-07-18 | 9 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by CALVIN GIBBS.(Maher, John) (Entered: 07/18/2022) |
2022-07-19 | | NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 4 Request for Summons to Issue, 3 Request for Summons to Issue, 2 Request for Summons to Issue. The following error(s) were found: incorrect summons was uploaded. No action is needed; request for summons were filed at ECF 7 - 9 .(znmg) (Entered: 07/19/2022) |
2022-07-19 | | Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (znmg) (Entered: 07/19/2022) |
2022-07-19 | 10 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 07/19/2022) |
2022-08-24 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by John Haberland on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Haberland, John) (Entered: 08/24/2022) |
2022-08-24 | 12 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haberland, John) (Entered: 08/24/2022) |
2022-08-25 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendant's 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, in which Defendant seeks an extension until September 26, 2022 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Defendant indicates that it has provided a recording in response to Plaintiff's FOIA request which it "believes satisfies Plaintiffs request," that Plaintiff is "reviewing the recording," and that the parties are "discuss[ing] whether there is a need for continued litigation in this matter." Plaintiff consents to the requested extension. The Court GRANTS Defendant's 12 motion nunc pro tunc and orders Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by no later than SEPTEMBER 26, 2022. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/25/22. (lcckk3) (Entered: 08/25/2022) |
2022-08-25 | 13 | ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/25/2022. (DM) (Entered: 08/25/2022) |
2022-08-25 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by no later than 9/26/2022. (dot) (Entered: 08/25/2022) |
2022-09-23 | 14 | MOTION to Dismiss by DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit)(Haberland, John) (Entered: 09/23/2022) |
2022-09-26 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendant's 14 Motion to Dismiss. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a response by no later than OCTOBER 7, 2022 and Defendant to file a reply by no later than OCTOBER 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/26/22. (lcckk3) (Entered: 09/26/2022) |
2022-09-26 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to 14 due by 10/7/2022. Defendant's Reply to 14 due by 10/14/2022. (dot) (Entered: 09/26/2022) |
2022-09-26 | 15 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Haberland, John) (Entered: 09/26/2022) |
2022-09-27 | 16 | ORDER dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/27/22. (lcckk3) (Entered: 09/27/2022) |
Hide Docket Events |