Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-07-14 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16044560.), filed by CLEAN AIR COUNCIL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Designation Form)(Cohen, Paul) (Entered: 07/14/2022) |
2022-07-18 | 2 | Summons Issued as to NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rf, ) (Entered: 07/18/2022) |
2022-07-26 | 3 | Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (rf, ) (Entered: 07/26/2022) |
2022-08-04 | 4 | AFFIDAVIT of Service by Stephen Ballentine re: served Summons and Complaint upon U.S. Department of Interior, National Park Service, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorney's Office for E.D. Pa. by USPS Certified Mail on 08/01/2022 (Cohen, Paul) (Entered: 08/04/2022) |
2022-08-10 | 5 | NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Joseph Anthony Ingrao on behalf of CLEAN AIR COUNCIL(Ingrao, Joseph) (Entered: 08/10/2022) |
2022-08-11 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by MARK J. SHERER on behalf of NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR with Certificate of Service(SHERER, MARK) (Entered: 08/11/2022) |
2022-08-17 | 7 | ORDER RE: THIS MATTER SHALL BE HELD IN ABEYANCE; DEFENDANT SHALL PRODUCE NON-EXEMPT RECORDS RESPONSIVE TO PLAINTIFF'S FOIA REQUEST; DEFENDANT SHALL COMPLETE ITS RESPONSE TO THE FOIA REQUEST; IN THE EVENT THIS CASE IS NOT RESOLVED BY NOVEMBER 29, 2022, THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A JOINT STATUS UPDATE ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 29, 2022. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 8/15/2022. 8/17/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl) (Entered: 08/17/2022) |
2022-11-29 | 8 | ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ITS AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 12/23/2022; THE DEFENDANT SHALL ANSWER OR RESPOND ON OR BEFORE 1/6/2023 AND THIRD PARTIES MAY FILE MOTIONS TO INTERVENE ON OR BEFORE 1/6/2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 11/29/2022. 11/29/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl) (Entered: 11/29/2022) |
2022-12-23 | 9 | AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by CLEAN AIR COUNCIL.(Cohen, Paul) (Entered: 12/23/2022) |
2023-01-04 | 10 | ORDER RE: THIRD PARTIES MAY FILE THEIR MOTIONS TO INTERVENE ON OR BEFORE 1/20/2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 1/4/2023. 1/4/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl) (Entered: 01/04/2023) |
2023-01-06 | 11 | ANSWER to 9 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR.(SHERER, MARK) (Entered: 01/06/2023) |
2023-01-19 | 12 | MOTION to Intervene filed by PHILADELPHIA GAS WORKS.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4 Part I, # 7 Exhibit 4 Part II, # 8 Exhibit 4 Part III, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Certificate of Service)(ZAHORCHAK, BRETT) (Entered: 01/19/2023) |
2023-01-20 | 13 | MOTION to Intervene filed by CONSTELLATION NEWENERGY, INC..memorandum, certificate of service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Intervene, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Memo of Law, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Intervene, # 4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service of Motion to Intervene)(DAUGHERTY, SALLY) (Entered: 01/20/2023) |
2023-01-23 | 14 | RESPONSE to Motion re 12 MOTION to Intervene (Non-Opposition to Motion) filed by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (SHERER, MARK) (Entered: 01/23/2023) |
2023-01-23 | 15 | RESPONSE to Motion re 13 MOTION to Intervene (Non-Opposition to Motion) filed by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (SHERER, MARK) (Entered: 01/23/2023) |
2023-01-23 | 16 | NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/17/2023 at 11:00 AM IN Chambers BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Supplement, # 3 Supplement)(sfl) (Entered: 01/23/2023) |
2023-01-25 | 17 | ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF CLEAN AIR COUNCIL SHALL RESPOND TO THE PROPOSED INTERVENORS MOTIONS ON OR BEFORE 2/3/23. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 1/24/23. 1/25/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 01/25/2023) |
2023-02-03 | 18 | RESPONSE to Motion re 13 MOTION to Intervene , 12 MOTION to Intervene Non-Opposition filed by CLEAN AIR COUNCIL. (Cohen, Paul) (Entered: 02/03/2023) |
2023-02-03 | 19 | ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO INTERVENE OF PHILADELPHIA GAS WORKS 12 , THE MOTION TO INTERVENE OF CONSTELLATION NEWENERGY INC. 13 , DEFENDANTS' NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO INTERVENE BY PHILADELPHIA GAS WORKS 14 , DEFENDANTS' NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO INTERVENE BY CONSTELLATION NEWENERGY INC. 15 , AND PLAINTIFFS NON-OPPOSITION TO PHILADELPHIA GAS WORKS' AND CONSTELLATION NEWENERGY, INC.'S MOTIONS TO INTERVENE 18 , IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTIONS (DOC. NOS. 12 & 13) ARE GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 2/3/23.2/6/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 02/06/2023) |
2023-03-01 | 20 | NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Paul Jay Cohen, II on behalf of CLEAN AIR COUNCIL(Cohen, Paul) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-01 | 21 | NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Otero on behalf of CLEAN AIR COUNCIL (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Otero, Lauren) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-01 | 22 | NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER G. BOMSTEIN on behalf of CLEAN AIR COUNCIL (BOMSTEIN, ALEXANDER) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-17 | 23 | Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER RULE 16 Conference held on 3/17/23. (JL) (Entered: 03/17/2023) |
2023-03-17 | 24 | ORDER THAT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 9/8/2023. ALL OTHER SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 3/17/23. 3/17/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 03/17/2023) |
2023-09-08 | 25 | MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PHILADELPHIA GAS WORKS.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Certificate of Service)(ZAHORCHAK, BRETT) (Entered: 09/08/2023) |
2023-09-08 | 26 | MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Statement of Material Facts, # 3 Memorandum, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4)(SHERER, MARK) (Entered: 09/08/2023) |
2023-09-08 | 27 | MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CONSTELLATION NEWENERGY, INC..Motion to Join Motion for Summary Judgment filed by PGW. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service for Constellation's Motion to Join Motion for Summary Judgment of PGW)(DAUGHERTY, SALLY) (Entered: 09/08/2023) |
2023-09-08 | 28 | First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEAN AIR COUNCIL.Motion for summary judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Brief in Support of SJM, # 2 Exhibit Brief Exh A, # 3 Exhibit Brief Exh B, # 4 Exhibit Brief Exh C, # 5 Supplement Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 6 Exhibit Facts Exh A, # 7 Exhibit Facts Exh B, # 8 Exhibit Facts Exh C, # 9 Exhibit Facts Exh D, # 10 Exhibit Facts Exh E, # 11 Exhibit Facts Exh F, # 12 Exhibit Facts Exh G, # 13 Exhibit Facts Exh H, # 14 Exhibit Facts Exh I, # 15 Exhibit Facts Exh J, # 16 Exhibit Facts Exh K, # 17 Exhibit Facts Exh L, # 18 Exhibit Facts Exh M, # 19 Exhibit Facts Exh N, # 20 Exhibit Facts Exh O, # 21 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order, # 22 Certificate of Service Plaintiff's Certificate of Service)(Otero, Lauren) (Entered: 09/08/2023) |
2023-09-28 | 29 | RESPONSE in Opposition re 28 First MOTION for Summary Judgment of Plaintiff Clean Air Council filed by PHILADELPHIA GAS WORKS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Response to Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 3 Memorandum of Law In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Certificate of Service)(ZAHORCHAK, BRETT) (Entered: 09/28/2023) |
2023-09-28 | 30 | RESPONSE in Opposition re 28 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CONSTELLATION NEWENERGY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Constellation's cert of service)(DAUGHERTY, SALLY) (Entered: 09/28/2023) |
2023-09-29 | 31 | RESPONSE in Opposition re 28 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Response to Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(SHERER, MARK) (Entered: 09/29/2023) |
2023-09-29 | 32 | RESPONSE to Motion re 28 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEAN AIR COUNCIL. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit Part 1 of Exh. A, # 4 Exhibit Part 2 of Exh. A, # 5 Certificate of Service, # 6 Supplement Response to Intervenors' MSJ)(Otero, Lauren) (Entered: 09/29/2023) |
2023-10-06 | 33 | RESPONSE in Support re 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (SHERER, MARK) (Entered: 10/06/2023) |
2023-12-11 | 34 | NOTICE of HEARING: AN ORAL ARGUMENT WILL BE HELD ON 1/25/2024 10:00 AM IN Courtroom 10B BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. Re: 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment 28 First MOTION for Summary Judgment 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment (bw) (Entered: 12/11/2023) |
2024-02-16 | 35 | NOTICE of Appearance by STACEY L.B. SMITH on behalf of NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR with Certificate of Service(SMITH, STACEY) (Entered: 02/16/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |