Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-07-15 | 1 | COMPLAINT against United States Army Corps of Engineers, Jacksonville District (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19779634) filed by Gale Construction Company. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Distel, Craig) (Entered: 07/15/2022) |
2022-07-18 | 2 | NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:22-cv-0782-TJC-PDB. (SJB) (Entered: 07/18/2022) |
2022-07-18 | 3 | PROPOSED summons to be issued by Gale Construction Company. (Distel, Craig) (Entered: 07/18/2022) |
2022-07-19 | 4 | NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KKH) (Entered: 07/19/2022) |
2022-07-19 | 5 | SUMMONS issued as to United States Army Corps of Engineers, Jacksonville District. (BD) (Entered: 07/19/2022) |
2022-08-02 | 6 | SUMMONS returned executed by Gale Construction Company. United States Army Corps of Engineers, Jacksonville District served on 7/22/2022, answer due 9/20/2022. (Distel, Craig) (Entered: 08/02/2022) |
2022-10-25 | 7 | ENDORSED ORDER directing plaintiff to file a notice no later than 11/8/2022 to advise the Court as to whether it has served process on defendant in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i). Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 10/25/2022. (KKH) (Entered: 10/25/2022) |
2022-11-03 | 8 | NOTICE of compliance re 7 Order no pdf, by Gale Construction Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Distel, Craig) (Entered: 11/03/2022) |
2022-12-29 | 9 | ORDER directing Plaintiff to inform the Court whether Plaintiff has properly served process on Defendant in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) no later than 1/20/2023. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 12/29/2022. (CKM) (Entered: 12/29/2022) |
2023-01-18 | 10 | NOTICE of compliance re 9 Order, by Gale Construction Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Furman, Chelsea) (Entered: 01/18/2023) |
2023-04-04 | 11 | ENDORSED ORDER directing Plaintiff to advise of the status of this case no later than 4/21/2023. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 4/4/2023. (CKM) (Entered: 04/04/2023) |
2023-04-11 | 12 | NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Gale Construction Company (Furman, Chelsea) (Entered: 04/11/2023) |
2023-04-13 | 13 | ORDER dismissing this case without prejudice pursuant to 12 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The Clerk should terminate all pending motions and deadlines and close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 4/13/2023. (CKM) (Entered: 04/13/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |