Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-08-16 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9447035) filed by KATHERINE EBAN FINKELSTEIN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to HHS, # 3 Summons to USAO-DC, # 4 Summons to USAG, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 08/16/2022) |
2022-08-18 | | Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (znmg) (Entered: 08/18/2022) |
2022-08-18 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 08/18/2022) |
2022-08-22 | 3 | STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 22, 2022. (lccjn2) (Entered: 08/22/2022) |
2022-09-19 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 09/19/2022) |
2022-09-28 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 09/28/2022) |
2022-09-29 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a Complaint and Defendant's Answer. Accordingly, the Plaintiff and Defendant shall meet and confer to discuss each of the matters set forth in Local Civil Rule 16.3(c). The Parties shall submit a Joint Meet and Confer Report addressing all topics listed in Local Civil Rule 16.3(c) on or before October 26, 2022. The Parties shall also submit a proposed scheduling order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3(d). After submission of the Joint Meet and Confer Report, the Court will, if necessary, schedule an Initial Scheduling Conference. Following submission of the Joint Meet and Confer Report or following the Initial Scheduling Conference, the Court will issue a Scheduling Order governing proceedings in the case. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 29, 2022. (lccjn2) (Entered: 09/29/2022) |
2022-09-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement due by 10/26/2022. (zcal) (Entered: 10/05/2022) |
2022-10-26 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 10/26/2022) |
2022-10-28 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/29/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/28/2022. (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 10/28/2022) |
2022-10-28 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 8/29/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/29/2022. (See Docket Entry 7 to view document). (zed) (Entered: 11/02/2022) |
2022-11-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the 6 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the Parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before February 1, 2023, and every 60 days thereafter until either party moves for a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, files a dispositive motion, or the case is terminated. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 8, 2022. (lccjn2) (Entered: 11/08/2022) |
2022-11-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/1/2023. (zcal) (Entered: 11/08/2022) |
2023-01-31 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 01/31/2023) |
2023-03-16 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 03/16/2023) |
2023-05-15 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHERINE EBAN FINKELSTEIN. (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 05/15/2023) |
2023-06-22 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 06/22/2023) |
2023-08-16 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 08/16/2023) |
2023-10-12 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHERINE EBAN FINKELSTEIN. (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 10/12/2023) |
2023-12-11 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHERINE EBAN FINKELSTEIN. (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 12/11/2023) |
2024-02-09 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHERINE EBAN FINKELSTEIN. (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 02/09/2024) |
2024-02-09 | 17 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Substituting for attorney Marsha Wellknown Yee (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 02/09/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |