Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-08-17 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9450531) filed by CITIZENS FOR THE PRESERVATION OF WAINSCOTT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Smith, Brooks) (Entered: 08/17/2022) |
2022-08-17 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR THE PRESERVATION OF WAINSCOTT, INC. (Smith, Brooks) (Entered: 08/17/2022) |
2022-08-17 | 3 | MOTION for Permission to Use Post Office Box Complaint With P.O. Box As Plaintiff's Address by CITIZENS FOR THE PRESERVATION OF WAINSCOTT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Brooks) Modified event on 8/19/2022 (znmw). (Entered: 08/17/2022) |
2022-08-19 | 4 | Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zmrl) Modified on 9/7/2022 (znmw). (Entered: 08/19/2022) |
2022-08-19 | 5 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 08/19/2022) |
2022-08-22 | 6 | ORDER granting 3 Motion for Permission to Use Post Office Box: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to List P.O. Box As Plaintiff's Address, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff may proceed with a P.O. Box as its address for purpose of Local Rule 5.1(c). Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 22, 2022. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 08/22/2022) |
2022-08-25 | 7 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- T. Scott Mills, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9469566. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CITIZENS FOR THE PRESERVATION OF WAINSCOTT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of T. Scott Mills, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Brooks) (Entered: 08/25/2022) |
2022-08-26 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney T. Scott Mills is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 26, 2022. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 08/26/2022) |
2022-08-31 | 8 | NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Scott Mills, Jr on behalf of CITIZENS FOR THE PRESERVATION OF WAINSCOTT, INC. (Mills, Thomas) (Entered: 08/31/2022) |
2022-08-31 | 9 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David P. Ross, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9483562. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CITIZENS FOR THE PRESERVATION OF WAINSCOTT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David P. Ross, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Brooks) (Entered: 08/31/2022) |
2022-08-31 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney David P. Ross is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 31, 2022. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 08/31/2022) |
2022-09-01 | 10 | NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Ross on behalf of CITIZENS FOR THE PRESERVATION OF WAINSCOTT, INC. (Ross, David) (Entered: 09/01/2022) |
2022-09-27 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by John Haberland on behalf of UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS (Haberland, John) (Entered: 09/27/2022) |
2022-09-27 | 12 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS.(Haberland, John) (Entered: 09/27/2022) |
2022-09-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Parties confer and submit a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings, which shall include a proposed schedule for the processing and release of responsive records or for briefing dispositive motions, by October 12, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on September 28, 2022. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 09/28/2022) |
2022-10-12 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Future Proceedings by UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haberland, John) (Entered: 10/12/2022) |
2022-10-14 | 14 | SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties shall file a joint status report by December 12, 2022. See document for scheduling order and information concerning case procedures. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on October 14, 2022. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 10/14/2022) |
2022-12-12 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS. (Haberland, John) (Entered: 12/12/2022) |
2023-02-23 | 16 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CITIZENS FOR THE PRESERVATION OF WAINSCOTT, INC.. Attorney David P. Ross terminated. (Mills, Thomas) (Entered: 02/23/2023) |
2023-03-10 | 17 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by CITIZENS FOR THE PRESERVATION OF WAINSCOTT, INC.. (Mills, Thomas) (Entered: 03/10/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |