Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-08-15 | 1 | COMPLAINT against Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation.Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Rozela A. Oliver. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Jonathan William McKinney. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of Complaint, # 2 Part 3 of Complaint, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (car) (Entered: 08/18/2022) |
2022-08-15 | 2 | SUPPORT DOCUMENTS filed by Plaintiff Jonathan William McKinney as to Complaint - (Discovery), 1 . (car) (Entered: 08/18/2022) |
2022-08-15 | 3 | REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Jonathan William McKinney. (car) (Entered: 08/18/2022) |
2022-08-18 | 4 | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) (Entered: 08/18/2022) |
2022-08-18 | 5 | NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 08/18/2022) |
2022-08-18 | 6 | Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 08/18/2022) |
2022-08-22 | 7 | TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/22/2022) |
2022-08-26 | 8 | ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS 3 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Ruling on the Request is POSTPONED for 30 days so that the filer may provide additional information. (iv) (Entered: 08/29/2022) |
2022-09-09 | 9 | REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Jonathan William McKinney. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Document) (iv) (Entered: 09/09/2022) |
2022-09-19 | 10 | ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:21-cv-09131 DSF(AGRx). Case transferred from Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-05775 DSF(AGRx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn) (Main Document 10 replaced on 10/12/2022) (jp). (Entered: 09/19/2022) |
2022-09-20 | 11 | STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (pk) (Entered: 09/20/2022) |
2022-10-12 | 12 | NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Document No. 10 was not properly flattened. The clerk will replace with a flattened version. (jp) (Entered: 10/12/2022) |
2022-10-14 | 13 | SUPPORT DOCUMENTS filed by Plaintiff Jonathan William McKinney. (jp) (Entered: 10/17/2022) |
2022-12-06 | 14 | ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer DENYING to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 3 , 9 . FURTHER ORDERED, this case is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 12/06/2022) |
Hide Docket Events |