Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-08-19 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9455579) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Defense)(Orfanedes, Paul) Modified on 8/24/2022 to correct docket entry text (zsb). (Entered: 08/19/2022) |
2022-08-19 | 2 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) Modified on 8/24/2022; refiled as Docket Entry 3 . (znmw). (Entered: 08/19/2022) |
2022-08-19 | 3 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests [Corrected] by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 08/19/2022) |
2022-08-23 | | Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmrl) (Entered: 08/23/2022) |
2022-08-23 | 4 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 08/23/2022) |
2022-08-24 | 5 | STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 24, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 08/24/2022) |
2022-09-14 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/23/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/22/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/29/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 9/8/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) Modified DOD serve date on 9/14/2022 (zed). (Entered: 09/14/2022) |
2022-09-16 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by John Haberland on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Haberland, John) (Entered: 09/16/2022) |
2022-09-16 | 8 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Cover Sheet,, Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haberland, John) (Entered: 09/16/2022) |
2022-09-19 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendant's 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and DIRECTING defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the 1 Complaint by October 28, 2022. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 19, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/19/2022) |
2022-09-19 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 10/28/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 09/19/2022) |
2022-10-28 | 9 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Haberland, John) (Entered: 10/28/2022) |
2022-11-17 | | VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER ENTERED ON 11/22/2022.....MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, by November 30, 2022, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.23. The parties have yet to file their abbreviated Joint Meet and Confer Report, which was due on November 11, 2022, fourteen days after defendant's 9 Answer. See 5 Standing Order 4.b.ii (identifying requirements for FOIA cases). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 17, 2022. (lcbah1) Modified on 11/23/2022 (hmc). (Entered: 11/17/2022) |
2022-11-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 11/30/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 11/18/2022) |
2022-11-21 | 10 | RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Order, filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/21/2022) |
2022-11-22 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) VACATING the Order to Show Cause and DIRECTING, upon consideration of plaintiff's 10 Response to Order to Show Cause, the parties to submit a joint status report by January 17, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 22, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 11/22/2022) |
2022-11-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/17/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 11/23/2022) |
2023-01-17 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haberland, John) (Entered: 01/17/2023) |
2023-01-17 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by March 20, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 17, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 01/17/2023) |
2023-01-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/20/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 01/18/2023) |
2023-03-20 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haberland, John) (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
2023-03-20 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status report, the parties to submit a joint status report by May 19, 2023. Signed by Judge Beryl A Howell on March 20, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
2023-03-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/19/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 03/21/2023) |
2023-05-17 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haberland, John) (Entered: 05/17/2023) |
2023-05-18 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status report, the parties to submit a joint status report by July 14, 2023. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 18, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 05/18/2023) |
2023-05-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/14/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 05/18/2023) |
2023-06-15 | 14 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Patrick Doyle on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Substituting for attorney John Haberland (Doyle, Patrick) (Entered: 06/15/2023) |
2023-07-14 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doyle, Patrick) (Entered: 07/14/2023) |
2023-07-14 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status report, the parties to submit a joint status report by September 19, 2023. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 14, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 07/14/2023) |
2023-07-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 07/18/2023) |
2023-09-19 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doyle, Patrick) (Entered: 09/19/2023) |
2023-09-20 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 16 Joint Status Report, to file, by November 20, 2023, a joint status report advising the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 20, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/20/2023) |
2023-09-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/20/2023 (mac) (Entered: 09/21/2023) |
2023-11-20 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doyle, Patrick) (Entered: 11/20/2023) |
2023-11-21 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 17 Joint Status Report, to file, by January 19, 2024, a joint status report, advising the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 21, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 11/21/2023) |
2023-11-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 1/19/2024. (mac) (Entered: 11/21/2023) |
2024-01-19 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doyle, Patrick) (Entered: 01/19/2024) |
2024-01-22 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 18 Joint Status Report, to file, by March 21, 2024, a joint status report, advising the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 22, 2024. (lcbah1) (Entered: 01/22/2024) |
2024-01-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 3/21/2024 (mac) (Entered: 01/23/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |