Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-09-01 | 1 | COMPLAINT against IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9486581) filed by SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC REPORTS, INC., DAVID BURNHAM (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Nelson, Scott) Modified parties on 9/6/2022 (znmw). (Entered: 09/01/2022) |
2022-09-01 | 2 | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC Reports, Inc.. Case related to Case No. 14-cv-0109. (Nelson, Scott) (Entered: 09/01/2022) |
2022-09-01 | 3 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests of TRAC Reports, Inc. by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC Reports, Inc. (Nelson, Scott) (Entered: 09/01/2022) |
2022-09-06 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (znmw) (Entered: 09/06/2022) |
2022-09-06 | 4 | SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 09/06/2022) |
2022-09-06 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to snelson@citizen.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (Wilkens, Nicole) (Entered: 09/06/2022) |
2022-09-07 | 5 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to (1) U.S.A.O. and (2) U.S.A.G. re 1 Complaint, filed by SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC REPORTS, INC., DAVID BURNHAM. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC REPORTS, INC..(Nelson, Scott) (Entered: 09/07/2022) |
2022-09-07 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Kirkpatrick on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 09/07/2022) |
2022-09-08 | 7 | SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (zed) (Entered: 09/08/2022) |
2022-10-11 | 8 | NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 10/11/2022) |
2022-10-11 | 9 | ANSWER to Complaint by IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 10/11/2022) |
2022-10-12 | 10 | ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before October 25, 2022. The Joint Status Report should address, among other things, (1) the status of Plaintiffs' FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs' FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiffs; (4) whether a motion for a stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Please see Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/12/2022. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/12/2022) |
2022-10-25 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC REPORTS, INC.. (Nelson, Scott) (Entered: 10/25/2022) |
2022-10-26 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by November 22, 2022, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive information. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/26/2022. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/26/2022) |
2022-11-22 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 11/22/2022) |
2022-11-23 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by February 22, 2023, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. The court declines to order, or require Defendant to commit to, a schedule for production at this time. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/23/2022. (lcapm3) (Entered: 11/23/2022) |
2023-02-22 | 13 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT Substituting for attorney Derek. S. Hammond (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 02/22/2023) |
2023-02-22 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 02/22/2023) |
2023-02-23 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by March 24, 2023, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/23/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 02/23/2023) |
2023-03-24 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 03/24/2023) |
2023-03-24 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by April 24, 2023, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/24/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 03/24/2023) |
2023-04-24 | 16 | NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 04/24/2023) |
2023-04-24 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 04/24/2023) |
2023-04-25 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by May 24, 2023, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/25/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 04/25/2023) |
2023-05-24 | 18 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC REPORTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Scott) (Entered: 05/24/2023) |
2023-05-30 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties shall submit their additional joint status report updating the Court on the processing and production of responsive records on or before May 31, 2023. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/30/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 05/30/2023) |
2023-05-31 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 05/31/2023) |
2023-06-01 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by June 30, 2023, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/01/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/01/2023) |
2023-06-30 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 06/30/2023) |
2023-07-04 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by August 30, 2023, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/04/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 07/04/2023) |
2023-08-30 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 08/30/2023) |
2023-08-31 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by September 27, 2023, which updates the court on the various matters raised in the parties' Joint Status Report of August 30, 2023. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/31/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/31/2023) |
2023-09-27 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC REPORTS, INC.. (Nelson, Scott) (Entered: 09/27/2023) |
2023-09-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by November 10, 2023, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/28/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/28/2023) |
2023-11-10 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC REPORTS, INC.. (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 11/10/2023) |
2023-11-13 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by January 9, 2024, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/13/2023. (lcapm3). (Entered: 11/13/2023) |
2024-01-09 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC REPORTS, INC.. (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 01/09/2024) |
2024-01-10 | 25 | NOTICE of Appearance by Nicolas Sansone on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sansone, Nicolas) (Entered: 01/10/2024) |
2024-01-12 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by February 9, 2024, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/12/2024. (lcapm3) (Entered: 01/12/2024) |
2024-02-09 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC REPORTS, INC.. (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2024) |
2024-02-13 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by March 11, 2024, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/13/2024. (lcapm3) (Entered: 02/13/2024) |
2024-02-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/11/2024. (smc) (Entered: 02/14/2024) |
2024-03-11 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC REPORTS, INC.. (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2024) |
2024-03-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by April 11, 2024, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/14/2024. (lcapm3) (Entered: 03/14/2024) |
2024-03-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/11/2024. (smc) (Entered: 03/14/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |