Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-09-09 | 1 | COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages against Internal Revenue Service (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19981351) filed by Mark A. Gyetvay. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons Internal Revenue Service, # 3 Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Proposed Summons Department of Justice)(Mueller, Matthew) (Entered: 09/09/2022) |
2022-09-12 | 2 | NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:22-cv-0572-SPC-NPM. (SJB) (Entered: 09/12/2022) |
2022-09-12 | 3 | CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/12/2022. (SPB) (Entered: 09/12/2022) |
2022-09-12 | 4 | SUMMONS issued as to Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (SPB) (Entered: 09/12/2022) |
2022-10-13 | 5 | RETURN of service executed on 9/21/22 by Mark A. Gyetvay as to Internal Revenue Service (Mueller, Matthew) Modified on 10/14/2022 to edit docket text (LMW). (Entered: 10/13/2022) |
2022-10-13 | 6 | RETURN of service executed on 9/19/22 by Mark A. Gyetvay as to United States of America/US Attorney (Mueller, Matthew) Modified on 10/14/2022 to edit docket text (LMW). (Entered: 10/13/2022) |
2022-11-14 | 7 | ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint, by Internal Revenue Service.(Carter, Kieran) Modified to reflect counsel notified of full use of case number on filings on 11/14/2022 (JK). (Entered: 11/14/2022) |
2022-11-17 | 8 | NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report by 12/23/2022. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 22572. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW) (Entered: 11/17/2022) |
2022-12-15 | 9 | NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Internal Revenue Service. Related case(s): Yes (Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 12/15/2022) |
2022-12-22 | 10 | CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Internal Revenue Service. (Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 12/22/2022) |
2022-12-22 | 11 | CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Mark A. Gyetvay. (Mueller, Matthew) (Entered: 12/22/2022) |
2022-12-23 | 12 | CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Mueller, Matthew) (Entered: 12/23/2022) |
2023-01-03 | 13 | NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kieran O'Neill Carter on behalf of Internal Revenue Service. Lead Counsel: Kieran O. Carter. (Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 01/03/2023) |
2023-01-04 | 14 | NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Matthew J. Mueller on behalf of Mark A. Gyetvay. Lead Counsel: Matthew J. Mueller. (Mueller, Matthew) (Entered: 01/04/2023) |
2023-01-19 | 15 | Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 1/19/2023. (DIGITAL) (WRW) (Entered: 01/19/2023) |
2023-01-20 | 16 | FOIA CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 1/20/2023. (WRW) (Entered: 01/20/2023) |
2023-01-20 | 17 | TEXT ORDER. With consent of the transferee judges, this action is transferred to Judges Badalamenti and Dudek. The Clerk is directed to reassign this matter accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 1/20/2023. (BB) (Entered: 01/20/2023) |
2023-01-23 | 18 | Case Reassigned to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. New case number: 2:22-cv-572-JLB-KCD. Judge Sheri Polster Chappell, Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell no longer assigned to the case. (SMG) (Entered: 01/23/2023) |
2023-09-25 | 19 | MOTION to Amend 16 Case Management Scheduling Order by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joy Gerdy Zogby and Exhibit A)(Carter, Kieran) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. (Entered: 09/25/2023) |
2023-10-10 | 20 | RESPONSE in Opposition re 19 MOTION to Amend 16 Case Management Scheduling Order filed by Mark A. Gyetvay. (Mueller, Matthew) (Entered: 10/10/2023) |
2023-10-25 | 21 | ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. An amended FOIA case management and scheduling order will enter separately. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 10/25/2023. (CGW) (Entered: 10/25/2023) |
2023-10-26 | 22 | AMENDED FOIA CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. See order for court deadlines and directives. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 10/26/2023. (AEH) (Entered: 10/26/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |