Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-09-19 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9530478) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Homeland Security, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Bekesha, Michael) Modified on 9/20/2022 to edit docket text (znmg). (Entered: 09/19/2022) |
2022-09-19 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/19/2022) |
2022-09-20 | | Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (znmg) (Entered: 09/20/2022) |
2022-09-20 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 09/20/2022) |
2022-09-29 | 4 | STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 29, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/29/2022) |
2022-10-04 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/20/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/20/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/26/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 9/26/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Brooke Paz)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2022) |
2022-10-14 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel H. Lum on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 10/14/2022) |
2022-10-20 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 10/20/2022) |
2022-10-20 | | MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before November 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 20, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 10/20/2022) |
2022-11-10 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 11/10/2022) |
2022-11-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before January 13, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 14, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 11/14/2022) |
2023-01-13 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 01/13/2023) |
2023-01-13 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before February 13, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 13, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 01/13/2023) |
2023-01-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/13/2023 (zjch, ) (Entered: 01/17/2023) |
2023-02-07 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 02/07/2023) |
2023-02-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 3, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 8, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 02/08/2023) |
2023-03-31 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Pitz on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Pitz, Taylor) (Entered: 03/31/2023) |
2023-03-31 | 12 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2023) |
2023-04-03 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 12 Stipulation of Dismissal, the plaintiff's claims against the defendant are DISMISSED with prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 3, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 04/03/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |