Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-09-12 | | Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 09/12/2022. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zcb, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022) |
2022-09-12 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT filed by LARRY GOOCH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(zcb, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022) |
2022-09-12 | 2 | MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LARRY GOOCH. (zcb, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022) |
2022-09-12 | 3 | PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by LARRY GOOCH (zcb, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022) |
2022-10-25 | 4 | MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/25/2022. (rj) (Entered: 10/28/2022) |
2022-10-25 | 5 | ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/25/2022. (rj) (Entered: 10/28/2022) |
Hide Docket Events |