Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-10-02 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9569657) filed by NICK TURSE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAG, # 3 Summons DOD, # 4 Summons OSD-JS, # 5 Summons USAO, # 6 Summons SOCOM)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 10/02/2022) |
2022-10-02 | 2 | SEALED DOCUMENT filed by NICK TURSE re 1 Complaint, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 10/02/2022) |
2022-10-03 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zcb, ) (Entered: 10/03/2022) |
2022-10-03 | 3 | SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb, ) (Entered: 10/03/2022) |
2022-11-02 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF DEFENSE / JOINT STAFF, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/02/2022) |
2022-11-09 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF DEFENSE / JOINT STAFF, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/09/2022) |
2022-11-10 | 6 | ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are before the court in this FOIA matter. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before November 23, 2022. The Joint Status Report should address, among other things, (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for a stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/10/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/10/2022) |
2022-11-23 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NICK TURSE. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 11/23/2022) |
2022-11-23 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by December 22, 2022, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/23/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/23/2022) |
2022-12-20 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NICK TURSE. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 12/20/2022) |
2022-12-21 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by March 3, 2023, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/21/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 12/21/2022) |
2023-03-03 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF DEFENSE / JOINT STAFF, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 03/03/2023) |
2023-03-07 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by May 3, 2023, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/07/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 03/07/2023) |
2023-05-03 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF DEFENSE / JOINT STAFF, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 05/03/2023) |
2023-05-04 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by June 16, 2023, which advises whether any disputed issues remain and, if so, proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/04/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/04/2023) |
2023-06-16 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF DEFENSE / JOINT STAFF, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 06/16/2023) |
2023-06-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by July 19, 2023, which advises whether any disputed issues remain and, if so, proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/16/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 06/16/2023) |
2023-07-19 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF DEFENSE / JOINT STAFF, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/19/2023) |
2023-07-24 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by August 19, 2023, which advises whether any disputed issues remain and, if so, proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/24/2023. (lcapm2) (Entered: 07/24/2023) |
2023-08-21 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NICK TURSE. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 08/21/2023) |
2023-08-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by September 21, 2023, which advises whether any disputed issues remain and, if so, proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/22/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/22/2023) |
2023-09-21 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NICK TURSE. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 09/21/2023) |
2023-09-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by October 23, 2023, which advises whether any disputed issues remain and, if so, proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/22/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 09/22/2023) |
2023-10-23 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF DEFENSE / JOINT STAFF, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/23/2023) |
2023-10-24 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by November 21, 2023, which advises whether any disputed issues remain and, if so, proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/24/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 10/24/2023) |
2023-11-21 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF DEFENSE / JOINT STAFF, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/21/2023) |
2023-11-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by December 20, 2023, which advises whether any disputed issues remain and, if so, proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/22/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/22/2023) |
2023-12-20 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF DEFENSE / JOINT STAFF, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 12/20/2023) |
2023-12-21 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before February 20, 2024, which advises whether any disputed issues remain and, if so, proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/21/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 12/21/2023) |
2024-02-20 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NICK TURSE. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 02/20/2024) |
2024-02-21 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before March 27, 2024, which advises whether any disputed issues remain and, if so, proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/21/2024. (lcapm1) (Entered: 02/21/2024) |
2024-02-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/27/2024. (smc) (Entered: 02/21/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |