Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-10-02 | 1 | COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9569662) filed by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to BLM, # 3 Summons to USAG, # 4 Summons To USAO - DC, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit 12, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit 14, # 19 Exhibit 15, # 20 Exhibit 16, # 21 Exhibit 17, # 22 Exhibit 18, # 23 Exhibit 19, # 24 Exhibit 20, # 25 Exhibit 21, # 26 Exhibit 22, # 27 Exhibit 23, # 28 Exhibit 24, # 29 Exhibit 25, # 30 Exhibit 26, # 31 Exhibit 27, # 32 Exhibit 28, # 33 Exhibit 29, # 34 Exhibit 30, # 35 Exhibit 31, # 36 Exhibit 32)(Sorenson, C.) Modified on 10/3/2022 to edit docket text (znmg). (Entered: 10/02/2022) |
2022-10-03 | | Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (znmg) (Entered: 10/03/2022) |
2022-10-03 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 10/03/2022) |
2022-10-05 | 3 | STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 5, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 10/05/2022) |
2022-11-09 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Duffey on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 11/09/2022) |
2022-11-09 | 5 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, with proposed order by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 11/09/2022) |
2022-11-10 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendant's 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and DIRECTING defendant to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's 1 Complaint by December 12, 2022. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 10, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 11/10/2022) |
2022-11-10 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/11/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/10/2022. (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 11/10/2022) |
2022-11-10 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/11/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 10/11/2022 (See Docket Entry 6 to view document) (zjm) (Entered: 11/15/2022) |
2022-11-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to plaintiff's 1 Complaint due by 12/12/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 11/14/2022) |
2022-11-15 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 6 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to petesorenson@gmail.com, cc'd 6 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Notice of Corrected Docket Entry: Your entry has been modified as a courtesy. Please note the appropriate reminders for future filings; do not refile document, 2. Please note the following for future filings; do not refile document , 3. DO NOT REFILE: Counsel reminded to file a return of service for each individual party served and enter date of delivery for each. (zjm, ) (Entered: 11/15/2022) |
2022-12-12 | 8 | ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 12/12/2022) |
2022-12-21 | 9 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File WITH PROPOSED ORDER by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 12/21/2022) |
2022-12-21 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendant's 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time and DIRECTING the parties to file their initial meet and confer statement by January 10, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 21, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 12/21/2022) |
2022-12-27 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement due by 1/10/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 12/27/2022) |
2023-01-10 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 01/10/2023) |
2023-01-12 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, the parties to file a Joint Status Report by March 10, 2023 proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 12, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 01/12/2023) |
2023-01-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/10/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 01/13/2023) |
2023-03-10 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 03/10/2023) |
2023-03-13 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties to file a Joint Status Report by May 15, 2023 proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 13, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 03/13/2023) |
2023-03-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/15/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-05-15 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 05/15/2023) |
2023-05-17 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the parties to file a Joint Status Report by July 14, 2023 proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 17, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 05/17/2023) |
2023-05-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/14/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 05/17/2023) |
2023-07-14 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 07/14/2023) |
2023-07-18 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, the parties to file a Joint Status Report by September 14, 2023 proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 18, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 07/18/2023) |
2023-07-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 07/18/2023) |
2023-09-14 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 09/14/2023) |
2023-09-15 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 14 Joint Status Report, to file a joint status report by October 16, 2023, advising the Court of the status of this matter and whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 15, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/15/2023) |
2023-09-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/16/2023 (mac) (Entered: 09/18/2023) |
2023-10-16 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 10/16/2023) |
2023-10-16 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 15 Joint Status Report, to file a joint status report by December 15, 2023, advising the Court of the status of this matter and whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 16, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 10/16/2023) |
2023-10-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2023. (mac) (Entered: 10/18/2023) |
2023-12-15 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 12/15/2023) |
2023-12-15 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, the following SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) by March 6, 2024, defendants shall file any motion for summary judgment; (2) by April 3, 2024, plaintiff shall file any opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment; (3) by May 1, 2024, defendants shall file any reply and opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion; and (4) by May 21, 2024, plaintiff shall file any reply in support of the cross-motion. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 15, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 12/15/2023) |
2023-12-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment due by 03/06/2024. Plaintiff Opposition And Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment due by 04/03/2024. Defendants Reply And Opposition To Plaintiff's Cross-Motion due by 05/01/2024. Plaintiff Reply In Support Of The Cross-Motion due by 05/21/2024. (mac) (Entered: 12/18/2023) |
2024-02-29 | 17 | Consent MOTION to Modify Summary judgment briefing schedule with proposed order by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 02/29/2024) |
2024-03-01 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendant's 17 Motion to Modify, and MODIFYING the SCHEDULING ORDER issued on December 15, 2023, as follows: (1) by April 8, 2024, defendants shall file any motion for summary judgment; (2) by May 8, 2024, plaintiff shall file any opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment; (3) by June 5, 2024, defendants shall file any reply and opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion; and (4) by July 3, 2024, plaintiff shall file any reply in support of the cross-motion. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 1, 2024. (lcbah1) (Entered: 03/01/2024) |
2024-03-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment due by 04/08/2024. (2) by May 8, 2024, Plaintiff Opposition And Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment due by 5/8/2024. (3) by June 5, 2024, Defendants Reply And Opposition To Plaintiff's Cross-Motion due by 6/5/2024. Plaintiff Reply In Support Of The Cross-Motion due by 7/3/2024. (mac) (Entered: 03/04/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |